Powell v. Saul
Plaintiff: Ariel R. Powell
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv00207
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob P. Phillips on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Phillips, Jacob)
August 20, 2019 Docket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket #8 , when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Agency record due within 60 days of the Defendant's initial appearance. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 8/20/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ariel R. Powell. Andrew M. Saul served on 8/9/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Eaglin, Paul)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Pomeroy on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Pomeroy, Richard)
July 31, 2019 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE: The Application to Waive the Filing Fee, at docket #3 , is granted. Service of Process is to be completed within 90 days. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 7/31/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Commissioner of Social Security, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney General, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ariel R. Powell.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Ariel R. Powell.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powell v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Richard L. Pomeroy
Represented By: Jacob P. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariel R. Powell
Represented By: Paul B. Eaglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?