Snead v. Wright et al
Plaintiff: Karen S. Snead
Defendant: Guadalupe C. Wright, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. and Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00209
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 15 JOINDER TO MOTION TO DISMISS by Transamerica Life Insurance Company #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Merrill Lynch's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.. (Cruickshank, George)
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by George M. Cruickshank (Cruickshank, George)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Merrill Lynch's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc..(Dawson, Jon)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.. (Dawson, Jon)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 JWS TEXT ORDER re #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The motion to extend time at docket 10 is granted as follows: Transamerica Life Ins. Co. shall have thru September 18, 2019, to respond to the Complaint. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension by Transamerica Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cruickshank, George)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by George M. Cruickshank on behalf of Transamerica Life Insurance Company (Cruickshank, George)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.'s answer due 9/13/2019. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 8/28/19. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Merrill Lynch's Unopposed Motion for Extension by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dawson, Jon)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 8/22/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon S. Dawson on behalf of Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. (Dawson, Jon)
July 31, 2019 Summons Issued as to Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Guadalupe C. Wright. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Guadalupe C. Wright, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Transamerica Life Insurance Company, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Karen S. Snead. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Transamerica Life Insurance Company, Guadalupe C. Wright (Filing fee $400/Receipt #ANC015995.), filed by Karen S. Snead.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snead v. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guadalupe C. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.
Represented By: Jon S. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: George M. Cruickshank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen S. Snead
Represented By: Jake W. Staser
Represented By: Laura S. Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?