Davis v. Nywonger et al
Plaintiff: Ben Davis
Defendant: Zane Nywonger and Bart Theisen
Case Number: 3:2019cv00212
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Referring Judge: Deborah M Smith
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Trial by Ben Davis.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 11, 2019 This matter is hereby reassigned to District Judge Burgess. The Magistrate Judge previously assigned in this matter will remain on the case as referral only. Parties are advised to use case number 3:19-cv-00212-TMB-DMS on all future filings. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
August 2, 2019 Notice of Assignment to a US Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent form. Please Note: Forms must NOT be electronically filed with the Court. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 8/23/2019. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 Unissued summons re ACCE, (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ben Davis. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zane Nywonger, Bart Theisen, filed by Ben Davis.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Nywonger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zane Nywonger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bart Theisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?