Harmon v. Dunleavy et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Harmon
Defendant: Craig Clarkson and Mike Dunleavy
Case Number: 3:2019cv00213
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Reconsideration re #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Stephen Harmon.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT THAT the Complaint, at Docket 1, is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 09/16/2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: The Complaint, at Docket 1, is DISMISSED with prejudice. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter a final judgment accordingly. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 09/13/2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Unissued summons re Defendant Mike Dunleavy, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Craig Clarkson)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Stephen Harmon #4 MOTION to Accept Plaintiff' Filings re #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Stephen Harmon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Accept Plaintiff' Filings re #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stephen Harmon.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stephen Harmon. (Attachments: #1 Account Statment)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Craig Clarkson, Mike Dunleavy, filed by Stephen Harmon.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harmon v. Dunleavy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Clarkson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Dunleavy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?