Harry v. State of Alaska
Petitioner: Kenneth W. Harry
Respondent: State of Alaska
Case Number: 3:2019cv00237
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: James K Singleton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT Signed by Judge James K. Singleton, Jr on 9/25/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Petition, at docket #1 , is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. All pending motion are DENIED as moot. The Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by Judge James K. Singleton, Jr on 9/23/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Representation/Status Hearing by Kenneth W. Harry.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Kenneth W. Harry. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 10/7/2019. Signed by Judge James K. Singleton, Jr on 9/6/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5/Receipt #ANC016105), filed by Kenneth W. Harry.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harry v. State of Alaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Alaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kenneth W. Harry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?