Balazhi et al v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ljumnie Balazhi and Shaziman Balazhi
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00241
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 15 SLG TEXT ORDER: Parties to disregard the form attached to the Initial Case Status Report Order at Docket #14 . (CME, COURT STAFF)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Fact Discovery due 07/01/2020. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/23/2019. Modified on 10/25/2019 to clarify text, NEF regenerated. (CME, COURT STAFF).
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sharon L. Gleason: Scheduling Conference held 10:03 a.m. to 10:23 a.m. on 10/16/2019. Court and counsel heard re punitive damages claims, bad faith claims and establishing deadlines for Scheduling and Planning Order. Oral motion for phasing discovery; DENIED. Fact discovery due 6/30/20, expert discovery due 8/31/20, expert reports due 6/30/20, rebuttle reports due 30 days after, witness lists due by 10/31/20. Motion deadlines to follow local civil rules. Jury trial estimated to be 10 days. Court to issue order. APPEARANCES: Theodore J. Stepovich for plaintiffs; Christina A. Rankin for defendant; Sonja L. Reeves, Official Court Reporter (RMC, COURT STAFF)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 SLG TEXT ORDER re #11 First MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference filed by Shaziman Balazhi, Ljumnie Balazhi is GRANTED. Scheduling Conference set for 10/11/2019 is VACATED and rescheduled to 10/16/2019 10:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Sharon L. Gleason. (CME, COURT STAFF)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Ljumnie Balazhi, Shaziman Balazhi.(Stepovich, Theodore)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/11/2019 at 11:00 a.m. in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Sharon L. Gleason. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/3/19. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF) Modified on 10/3/2019 to include correct PDF and regenerate NEF (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF).
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Rankin, Christina)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(Rankin, Christina)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Rankin, Christina)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Rankin, Christina)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re Initial Scheduling & Planning Conference Report. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 9/9/19. (Attachments: #1 Form)(LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Rankin, Christina)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Rankin, Christina)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company from Superior Court, case number 3AN-19-08724CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2755673), filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Notice)(Rankin, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Balazhi et al v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christina A. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ljumnie Balazhi
Represented By: Theodore J. Stepovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaziman Balazhi
Represented By: Theodore J. Stepovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?