Grant v. Special Collection Service
Plaintiff: William Lee Grant, II
Defendant: Special Collection Service
Case Number: 3:2019cv00248
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Referring Judge: Deborah M Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 10/30/19. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL; complaint is dismissed with prejudice. All pending motions denied as moot. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 10/30/19. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 ADDITIONAL RELATED DOCUMENT Exhibit in Support by William Lee Grant, II re #1 Complaint. (PXS, COURT STAFF) (Main Document 6 replaced on 10/30/2019) (PXS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/30/2019 to reflect date filed and regenerated NEF(PXS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 TMB TEXT ORDER: By agreement of the judges, this case is now assigned to Judge Ralph R. Beistline. All future filings should use the case number 3:19-cv-248-RRB. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Lee Grant, II.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Special Collection Service, filed by William Lee Grant, II.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. Special Collection Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lee Grant, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Collection Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?