Mason et al v. BP Exploration (Alaska) Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tracy Mason and Angela Mason
Defendant: Gas Clip Technologies, State of Alaska and BP Exploration (Alaska) Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00250
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S TEXT NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: An answer has not been filed by, nor default taken as to defendant Gas Clip Technologies that was served in this case. Plaintiff will respond to this notice of deficiency on or before 11/20/19 by filing a motion for entry of default or explaining why a motion for entry of default has not been filed. Failure to respond to this deficiency notice may result in the dismissal of the complaint for lack of prosecution as to that defendant. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 BP Exploration (Alaska), Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Entry of Appearance by BP Exploration (Alaska) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Entry of Appearance)(Lamb, Timothy)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Angela Mason, Tracy Mason re Summons Issued for Gas Clips Technologies, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bloom, Sara)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Angela Mason, Tracy Mason re Summons Issued for BP (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bloom, Sara)
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 JWS TEXT ORDER re #6 Notice (Other). The motion (Notice) at docket 6 is granted as follows: all plaintiff's claims against the State of Alaska are dismissed without prejudice. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE To Dismiss State of Alaska without Prejudice by Angela Mason, Tracy Mason (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bloom, Sara)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 9/24/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to BP Exploration (Alaska) Inc., Gas Clip Technologies, State of Alaska. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant BP Exploration (Alaska) Inc., (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant State of Alaska, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Gas Clip Technologies)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Angela Mason, Tracy Mason. (Bloom, Sara)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Bloom, Sara)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BP Exploration (Alaska) Inc., State of Alaska, and Gas Clip Technologies) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2757710.), filed by Tracy Mason, Angela Mason. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Bloom, Sara) Modified on 9/19/2019 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason et al v. BP Exploration (Alaska) Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gas Clip Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration (Alaska) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Mason
Represented By: Sara Lynne Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Mason
Represented By: Sara Lynne Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?