Thogmartin v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Julia Thogmartin
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00252
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Colbo, Kimberlee)
November 14, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Kimberlee Colbo re #15 Reply to Response to Motion by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Colbo, Kimberlee)
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Sever and Stay "Bad Faith" Claims filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Colbo, Kimberlee)
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Sever and Stay "Bad Faith" Claims filed by Julia Thogmartin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Barber, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2021 at 3:00 p.m. and Trial by Jury set for 3/15/2021 at 9:00 a.m. in Anchorage Courtroom 3 before Sharon L. Gleason. See Order test for further details. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 11/8/19. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Fact Discovery completed by 9/18/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/16/2020. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 11/7/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 11/8/2019 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Kimberlee A. Colbo re #10 MOTION to Sever and Stay "Bad Faith" Claims by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Colbo, Kimberlee)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Sever and Stay "Bad Faith" Claims by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Proposed Order)(Colbo, Kimberlee)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Colbo, Kimberlee)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Deficient Filing(s), #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal of Civil Action filed October 17, 2019, #3 Exhibit Substitution of Counsel and Entry of Appearance, signed October 21, 2019)(Colbo, Kimberlee)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING AND PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order.. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/2/19. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Colbo, Kimberlee)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Colbo, Kimberlee)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Colbo, Kimberlee)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Alaska Superior Court, case number 3AN-19-09411 CI. ( Filing fee $400/Receipt #ANC016167), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons and Notice to Both Parties, #4 Notice of Service of Process, #5 Notice of Removal of Civil Action, #6 Certificate of Service)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thogmartin v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Kimberlee A. Colbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Thogmartin
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?