Dimick v. Allstate Corporation, The
Plaintiff: Christopher Ryan Dimick, Drake William Dimick, Laura Kristine Dimick, Drake (I) William Dimick, Laura (I) Kristine Dimick and Christopher (I) Ryan Dimick
Defendant: Julie Anderson, Alaska Bar Association, Simon Ford, Amanda Price, Julie Poindexter, State of Alaska, Alaska Department of Law, Louise R. Driscoll, Alex Romero, Ethan Berkowitz, Ronny Simmons, Department of Commerce, Community, and Econmic Development, Division of Corporations, Business, and Professional Licensing, Department of Public Safety, Clayton & Dierner, LLC, Lenny DiPaolo, Elizabeth Slattery, U.S. Department of Justice Office of the Inspector General, Alaska State Troopers, Alaska Financial Crimes Task Force, Anchorage Police Department, Division of Insurance, Adam Crum, Kevin G. Clarkson, Allstate Corporation, The, Christopher A. Wray, Edward S. Grover, US Attorney Bryan Schroder, Eric Odegard, Nelson Franklin, United States Postal Service, Office of Inspector General, Erin Egan, Shawn Williams, Scott Leaders, Lori Wing-Heier, Justin Doll, Michael E. Horowitz, Thomas Wilson, Peninsula Reporting, Gregory C. Swank, Franklin & Associates, Alaska Department of Health and Social Services, Maryanne Boreen, Peter Diemer, Iliamna Lock and Key Mobile Locksmith Services, Michael Oglesby, Brandon Elkins, Brenda Silva, Steven Terner Mnuchin, David Silva, VeriClaim, Kevin K. McAleenan, Daniel Wilkerson, Al Clayton, Jr., Ehrhardt, Kelly & Cooly, Department of Commerce, Community and Economic Development, Chuck Rettig and Jim Lane
Case Number: 3:2019cv00262
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Filing 33 Case transferred in from District of Colorado; Case Number 1:19-cv-01240. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER TO TRANSFER COMPLAINT. The Court finds that Plaintiff's claims could have been brought in a federal district court in the District of Alaska and that it would be in the interest of justice to transfer this Complaintto the District of Alaska, Anchorage Division, rather than to dismiss these claims. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Complaint and action will be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Alaska, Anchorage Division, 222 W. 7th Avenue, Anchorage, Alaska 99513 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a), by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/30/2019. (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of Service by Certified Mail by Clerk of Court re 29 Minute Order to Christopher Ryan Dimick at 585 25 1/2 Road Unit 143 Grand Junction, CO 81502; Laura Kristine Dimick at 585 25 1/2 Road Unit 143 Grand Junction, CO 81502; Drake William Dimick at 585 25 1/2 Road Unit 143 Grand Junction, CO 81502. (Attachments: #1 USPS Certified Mail, #2 USPS Certified Mail) (tsher, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 30 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Christopher Ryan Dimick, Christopher (I) Ryan Dimick, Drake William Dimick, Drake (I) William Dimick, Laura Kristine Dimick, Laura (I) Kristine Dimick. Consent Form signed by Plaintiffs only. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (athom, ) Modified on 9/23/2019 to correct text (athom, ). [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER-- The SHOW CAUSE Order to Plaintiffs regarding service is discharged with the following additional ORDER. Plaintiffs SHALL insure that all Defendants are served with the current operative complaint (ECF #15). While it is uncertain exactly which complaint Plaintiffs are referring to in their show cause response, see ECF #28, p. 4, para. 6, when Plaintiffs state "most current amended complaint," it appears that Plaintiffs may be referring to ECF #21. That filing was stricken for the reasons set forth in a minute order found at ECF #23. Therefore, Plaintiffs are to insure that Defendants are served with the current operative complaint which is ECF #15. The Clerk of Court Shall serve Plaintiffs with this ORDER by certified mailreturn receipt. So Ordered. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/19/2019. Text Only Entry (GPG) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #19 by Plaintiffs Christopher Ryan Dimick, Christopher (I) Ryan Dimick, Drake William Dimick, Drake (I) William Dimick, Laura Kristine Dimick, Laura (I) Kristine Dimick. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 27 RECEIPT Returned Green card for Certified Mail on Christopher Ryan Dimick on 9/11/2019 #19 Order to Show Cause, re: #20 Certificate of Service (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 26 RECEIPT Returned Green card for Certified Mail on Drake William Dimick on 9/11/2019 #19 Order to Show Cause, re: #20 Certificate of Service (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 25 RECEIPT Returned Green card for Certified Mail on Laura Dimick on 9/11/2019 #19 Order to Show Cause re: #20 Certificate of Service, (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent/Non-Consent form included in Mailing to Pro-se Plaintiff. TEXT ONLY ENTRY (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
September 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs filing titled complaint for a civil case (ECF #21), filed 9/3/2019, is hereby struck for failure to comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15. The pleading, Plaintiffs 5th attempt to file a complaint, was not authorized by the Court and no conferral is noted therein. ECF #21 is therefore struck. So Ordered. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/7/2019. Text Only Entry (GPG) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Service by Certified Mail by Clerk of Court re #19 Order to Show Cause to Christopher Ryan Dimick at 585 25 1/2 Road Unit 143 Grand Junction, CO 81502; Laura Kristine Dimick at 585 25 1/2 Road Unit 143 Grand Junction, CO 81502; Drake William Dimick at 585 25 1/2 Road Unit 143 Grand Junction, CO 81502. Text Only Entry. (Attachments: #1 USPS Certified Mail, #2 USPS Certified Mail) (tsher, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/5/2019 returnable by Plaintiffs as to why this action should this action should not be dismissed for failure to timely serve process. Show Cause Response due by 9/26/2019. (tsher, )[Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS REQUEST re #15 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiffs Christopher Ryan Dimick, Christopher (I) Ryan Dimick, Drake William Dimick, Drake (I) William Dimick, Laura Kristine Dimick, Laura (I) Kristine Dimick. (Attachments: #1 Summons Alex Romero, #2 Summons Lori Wing-Heier, #3 Summons Peter Diemer, #4 Summons Simon Ford, #5 Summons Adam Crum, #6 Summons Amanda Price, #7 Summons Brandon Elkins, #8 Summons Christopher Wray, #9 Summons Chuck Rettig, #10 Summons Daniel Wilkerson, #11 Summons David A. Silva, #12 Summons Debra Silva, #13 Summons Edward Grover, #14 Summons Kelly Ehrhardt, #15 Summons Elizabeth Slattery, #16 Summons Erin Egan, #17 Summons Gregory Swank, #18 Summons Jim Lane, #19 Summons Julie Anderson, #20 Summons Justin Doll, #21 Summons Kevin Clarkson, #22 Summons Kevin McAleenan, #23 Summons Lennie DePaulo, #24 Summons Louise Driscoll, #25 Summons Michael Horowitz, #26 Summons Michael Oglesby, #27 Summons Nelson Franklin, #28 Summons Ronnie Simmons, #29 Summons Bryan Schroder, #30 Summons Scot Leaders, #31 Summons Thomas Wilson)(evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 21 STRICKEN TENDERED Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Christopher Ryan Dimick, Christopher (I) Ryan Dimick, Drake William Dimick, Drake (I) William Dimick, Laura Kristine Dimick, Laura (I) Kristine Dimick (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (evana, ) (Modified on 9/9/2019 stricken pursuant to the 23 Minute Order)(evana, ). [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 Administrative Notice: The Summonses submitted by mail are incomplete and will not be issued - documents retuned to Plaintiff. ALL defendants must be listed in the caption on each summons that is to issue. If space is an issue when listing each named Defendant, please attach a continuation sheet of the named Defendants to each summons. Please make the corrections and resubmit (evana, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #14 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Defendants Allstate Corporation, The, Edward S. Grover, Julie Poindexter, Thomas Wilson. (Logan, Cedric) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
June 2, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM regarding #14 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Julie Poindexter, Edward S. Grover, Thomas Wilson, Allstate Corporation, The. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/2/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc2) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alaska Bar Association, Allstate Corporation, The, Julie Anderson, Kevin G. Clarkson, Al Clayton, Jr, Clayton & Dierner, LLC, Adam Crum, Lenny DiPaolo, Peter Diemer, Justin Doll, Louise R. Driscoll, Erin Egan, Ehrhardt, Kelly & Cooly, Brandon Elkins, Simon Ford, Nelson Franklin, Franklin & Associates, Edward S. Grover, Michael E. Horowitz(FBI, U.S. Department of Justice Office of the Inspector General), Michael E. Horowitz(USPS Inspector, United States Post Office, Office of Inspector General), Iliamna Lock and Key Mobile Locksmith Services, Jim Lane, Scott Leaders, Kevin K. McAleenan, Peninsula Reporting, Amanda Price, Chuck Rettig, Alex Romero, Bryan Schroder, Brenda Silva, David Silva, Ronny Simmons, Elizabeth Slattery, State of Alaska, Alaska Department of Law, Gregory C. Swank, U.S. Department of Justice Office of the Inspector General, United States Postal Service, Office of Inspector General, VeriClaim, Daniel Wilkerson, Shawn Williams, Thomas Wilson, Lori Wing-Heier, Christopher A. Wray, Department of Commerce, and Economic Development, Division of Banking and Securities, Department of Public Safety, Division of Insurance, Eric Odegard, filed by Christopher Ryan Dimick, Christopher (I) Ryan Dimick, Laura (I) Kristine Dimick, Drake (I) William Dimick, Drake William Dimick, Laura Kristine Dimick. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(evana, ) Modified on 5/31/2019 (evana, ). [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Defendants Allstate Corporation, The, Edward S. Grover, Julie Poindexter, Thomas Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Allstate Summons - 05-07-19)(Logan, Cedric) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 13 Administrative Notice: The Summonses submitted by mail are incomplete and will not be issued - documents retuned to Plaintiff. All defendants must be listed in the caption - et al can not be used. Please makes corrections and resubmit. (Text Only Entry) (athom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re 9 Minute Order, 11 Amended Minute Order. Minute Orders Mailed to Christopher Ryan Dimick, Laura Kristine Dimick, and Drake William Dimick at 585 25 1/2 Road, Unit 143, Grand Junction, CO 81502. Text Only Entry (athom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT: On May 3, 2019, Magistrate Judge Mix Ordered (ECF #6) Plaintiffs to file an amended complaint which complies with Rule 8(a). That Order (ECF #6) is incorporated herein in its entirety. Plaintiffs were instructed that their complaint must contain (1) a short and plain statement of the grounds for the courts jurisdiction...; (2) a short and plain statement of the claim showing that the pleader is entitled to relief; and (3) a demand for the relief sought. Fed.R.Civ.P. 8. Plaintiffs original complaint (ECF #1) is devoid of these basic requirements of pleading and thus subject to dismissal as stated by Magistrate Judge Mix. See Order directing Plaintiffs to file an amended complaint (ECF #6). On May 7, 2019 and May 9, 2019, Plaintiffs filed documents titled complaint. (ECF #8 and ECF #10). Other than some changes to the list of Defendants, these complaints are substantially similar to the original complaint and also fail to meet the pleading requirements of Rule 8 for the same reasons as set forth in Magistrate Judge Mixs Order. As it is incumbent upon the Court to liberally construe Plaintiffs pro se pleadings, see Haines v. Kerner, 404 U.S. 519, 520-21 (1972), the Court will afford Plaintiffs one final opportunity to file an amended complaint complying with Rule 8 as outlined in Magistrate Judge Mixs Order (ECF #6). Plaintiffs may file their amended complaint no later than June 3, 2019. Plaintiffs are again advised that failure to state a claim will subject their case to dismissal pursuant to Rules 8(a) and/or 12(b). Plaintiffs are again encouraged to seek the guidance of the Federal Pro Se Clinic at (303) 380-8786. Plaintiffs will not be charged any fee for the lawyers time and assistance. The Clerk of Court Shall serve Plaintiffs with this Order. So Ordered, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 05/10/2019. Text Only Entry (athom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR A CIVIL CASE against Alaska Bar Association, Alaska Department of Health and Social Services, Alaska Financial Crimes Task Force, Allstate Corporation, The, Anchorage Police Department, Julie Anderson, Ethan Berkowitz, Maryanne Boreen, Kevin G. Clarkson, Al Clayton, Jr, Clayton & Dierner, LLC, Adam Crum, Department of Commerce, Community, and Econmic Development, Division of Corporations, Business, and Professional Licensing, Department of Commerce, Community, and Economic Development, Department of Public Safety, Lenny DiPaolo, Peter Diemer, Division of Insurance, Justin Doll, Louise R. Driscoll, Erin Egan, Ehrhardt, Kelly & Cooly, Brandon Elkins, Simon Ford, Nelson Franklin, Franklin & Associates, Edward S. Grover, Michael E. Horowitz(FBI, U.S. Department of Justice Office of the Inspector General), Michael E. Horowitz(USPS Inspector, United States Post Office, Office of Inspector General), Iliamna Lock and Key Mobile Locksmith Services, Jim Lane, Scott Leaders, Kevin K. McAleenan, Steven Terner Mnuchin, Eric Odegard, Michael Oglesby, Peninsula Reporting, Julie Poindexter, Amanda Price, Chuck Rettig, Alex Romero, Bryan Schroder, Brenda Silva, David Silva, Ronny Simmons, Elizabeth Slattery, State of Alaska, Alaska Department of Law, Gregory C. Swank, U.S. Department of Justice Office of the Inspector General, United States Postal Service, Office of Inspector General, VeriClaim, Daniel Wilkerson, Shawn Williams, Thomas Wilson, Lori Wing-Heier, filed by Christopher Ryan Dimick, Christopher (I) Ryan Dimick, Laura (I) Kristine Dimick, Drake (I) William Dimick, Drake William Dimick, Laura Kristine Dimick. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (athom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT: On May 3, 2019, Magistrate Judge Mix Ordered (ECF #6) Plaintiffs to file an amended complaint which complies with Rule 8(a). That Order (ECF #6) is incorporated herein in its entirety. Plaintiffs were instructed that their complaint must contain (1) a short and plain statement of the grounds for the courts jurisdiction...; (2) a short and plain statement of the claim showing that the pleader is entitled to relief; and (3) a demand for the relief sought. Fed.R.Civ.P. 8. Plaintiffs original complaint (ECF #1) is devoid of these basic requirements of pleading and thus subject to dismissal as stated by Magistrate Judge Mix. See Order directing Plaintiffs to file an amended complaint (ECF #6).On May 8, 2019, Plaintiffs filed another document titled complaint. (ECF #6). Other than some changes to the list of Defendants, this complaint is substantially similar to the original complaint and also fails to meet the pleading requirements of Rule 8 for the same reasons as set forth in Magistrate Judge Mixs Order.As it is incumbent upon the Court to liberally construe Plaintiffs pro se pleadings, see Haines v. Kerner, 404 U.S. 519, 520-21 (1972), the Court will afford Plaintiffs one final opportunity to file an amended complaint complying with Rule 8 as outlined in Magistrate Judge Mixs Order (ECF #6). Plaintiffs may file their amended complaint no later than June 3, 2019.Plaintiffs are again advised that failure to state a claim will subject their case to dismissal pursuant to Rules 8(a) and/or 12(b). Plaintiffs are again encouraged to seek the guidance of the Federal Pro Se Clinic at (303) 380-8786. Plaintiffs will not be charged any fee for the lawyers time and assistance.The Clerk of Court Shall serve Plaintiffs with this Order. So Ordered. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/8/2019. Text Only Entry (GPG) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR A CIVIL CASE against Alaska Bar Association, Alaska Department of Health and Social Services, Alaska Financial Crimes Task Force, Allstate Corporation, The, Anchorage Police Department, Julie Anderson, Ethan Berkowitz, Maryanne Boreen, Kevin G. Clarkson, Al Clayton, Jr, Clayton & Dierner, LLC, Adam Crum, Department of Commerce, Community, and Econmic Development, Division of Corporations, Business, and Professional Licensing, Department of Commerce, Community, and Economic Development, Lenny DiPaolo, Peter Diemer, Division of Insurance, Justin Doll, Louise R. Driscoll, Erin Egan, Ehrhardt, Kelly & Cooly, Simon Ford, Franklin & Associates, Edward S. Grover, Iliamna Lock and Key Mobile Locksmith Services, Jim Lane, Scott Leaders, Kevin K. McAleenan, Eric Odegard, Michael Oglesby, Peninsula Reporting, Julie Poindexter, Chuck Rettig, Alex Romero, Brenda Silva, David Silva, Elizabeth Slattery, State of Alaska, Alaska Department of Law, U.S. Department of Justice Office of the Inspector General, United States Postal Service, Office of Inspector General, VeriClaim, Daniel Wilkerson, Shawn Williams, Lori Wing-Heier, Thomas Wilson, Department of Public Safety, Amanda Price, Michael E. Horowitz, Michael E. Horowitz, Nelson Franklin, Bryan Schroder, Ronny Simmons, Brandon Elkins, Gregory C. Swank, Steven Terner Mnuchin, filed by Christopher Ryan Dimick, Christopher (I) Ryan Dimick, Laura (I) Kristine Dimick, Drake (I) William Dimick, Drake William Dimick, Laura Kristine Dimick. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (athom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: This matter has its factual nexus in Mesa County. According to the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. Because the jury will be drawn from that Division, it is appropriate that the case be managed, for pretrial purposes, by Magistrate Judge Gallagher in Grand Junction. Accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), and as approved by the Chief Judge of the Court, the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 19-cv-01240-CMA-GPG. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/7/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc2) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/3/19. (lgale, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix is designated to conduct ALLMTN proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiffs are directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than July 29, 2019, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/30/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc2) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM Exercising my prerogative as a Senior Judge, I request that this action be reassigned, by Judge John L. Kane. This case has been randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello for all further proceedings. (cthom, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Summonses submitted contain an incomplete caption and will not be issued. Captions must list all plaintiffs and defendants. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge John L. Kane and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR A CIVIL CASE against Alaska Bar Association, Alaska Department of Health and Social Services, Alaska Financial Crimes Task Force, Allstate Corporation, The, Anchorage Police Department, Julie Anderson, Ethan Berkowitz, Maryanne Boreen, Kevin G. Clarkson, Al Clayton, Jr, Clayton & Dierner, LLC, Adam Crum, Department of Commerce, Community, and Econmic Development, Division of Corporations, Business, and Professional Licensing, Department of Commerce, Community, and Economic Development, Lenny DiPaolo, Peter Diemer, Division of Insurance, Justin Doll, Louise R. Driscoll, Erin Egan, Ehrhardt, Kelly & Cooly, Simon Ford, Franklin & Associates, Edward S. Grover, Iliamna Lock and Key Mobile Locksmith Services, Jim Lane, Scott Leaders, Kevin K. McAleenan, Eric Odegard, Michael Oglesby, Peninsula Reporting, Julie Poindexter, Chuck Rettig, Alex Romero, Brenda Silva, David Silva, Elizabeth Slattery, State of Alaska, Alaska Department of Law, U.S. Department of Justice Office of the Inspector General, United States Postal Service, Office of Inspector General, VeriClaim, Daniel Wilkerson, Shawn Williams, Lori Wing-Heier (Filing Fee: $400.00Receipt Number:COX090035), filed by Christopher Ryan Dimick, Christopher (I) Ryan Dimick, Laura (I) Kristine Dimick, Drake (I) William Dimick, Drake William Dimick, Laura Kristine Dimick.(cmadr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 10/2/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dimick v. Allstate Corporation, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Bar Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Poindexter
Represented By: Cedric Dwight Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska, Alaska Department of Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louise R. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethan Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronny Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Commerce, Community, and Econmic Development, Division of Corporations, Business, and Professional Licensing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton & Dierner, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenny DiPaolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Slattery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice Office of the Inspector General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska State Troopers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Financial Crimes Task Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchorage Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division of Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Crum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin G. Clarkson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Corporation, The
Represented By: Cedric Dwight Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher A. Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward S. Grover
Represented By: Cedric Dwight Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney Bryan Schroder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Odegard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service, Office of Inspector General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Leaders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Wing-Heier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Doll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael E. Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Wilson
Represented By: Cedric Dwight Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peninsula Reporting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory C. Swank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Department of Health and Social Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryanne Boreen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Diemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iliamna Lock and Key Mobile Locksmith Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Oglesby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Terner Mnuchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VeriClaim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Clayton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ehrhardt, Kelly & Cooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Commerce, Community and Economic Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chuck Rettig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Ryan Dimick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drake William Dimick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Kristine Dimick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drake (I) William Dimick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura (I) Kristine Dimick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher (I) Ryan Dimick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?