Arctic Ice Fisheries, LLC v. Leichentritt
Plaintiff: Arctic Ice Fisheries, LLC
Defendant: Brandon Leichentritt
Case Number: 3:2019cv00264
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER accepting #10 Status Report. The parties shall proceed as they have proposed, with a further filing due 12/6/2019. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT Second by Arctic Ice Fisheries, LLC. (McVittie, Eric)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER accepting #8 Status Report. A further report, advising of arrangements for mediation and consolidation, due by 12/2/2019. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT by Arctic Ice Fisheries, LLC. (McVittie, Eric)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re Status of Defendant. Plaintiff will please call upon defendant to respond to the complaint, apply for entry of default, or file a status report on or before seven days. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 11/15/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Brandon Leichentritt on 10/24/2019, filed by Arctic Ice Fisheries, LLC. (McVittie, Eric)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER proof of service or status report due within seven days. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 10/16/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 7, 2019 Summons Issued as to Brandon Leichentritt. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Brandon Leichentritt, (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment on Maritime Benefits against Brandon Leichentritt ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2768842.), filed by Arctic Ice Fisheries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant)(McVittie, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arctic Ice Fisheries, LLC v. Leichentritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Leichentritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arctic Ice Fisheries, LLC
Represented By: Eric McVittie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?