Bristol Bay Economic Development Corporation et al v. Hladick et al
Plaintiff: Bristol Bay Reserve Association, United Tribes of Bristol Bay, Bristol Bay Economic Development Corporation, Bristol Bay Regional Seafood Development Association, Inc., Bristol Bay Native Association, Inc., Cook Inletkeeper, Wild Salmon Center, National Parks Conservation Association, Alaska Wilderness League, McNeil River Alliance, National Wildlife Federation, SalmonState, Trout Unlimited, Alaska Community Action On Toxics, Earthworks, Alaska Center, Friends of McNeil River, Sierra Club, Defenders of Wildlife and Natural Resources Defense Council
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Chris Hladick, Matthew Z. Leopold and Andrew Wheeler
Case Number: 3:2019cv00265
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Referring Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on William Barr on 10/09/2019, filed by Alaska Center, Alaska Community Action On Toxics, Alaska Wilderness League, Cook Inletkeeper, Defenders of Wildlife, Friends of McNeil River, McNeil River Alliance, National Parks Conservation Association, National Wildlife Federation, SalmonState, Sierra Club, Wild Salmon Center. (Strong, Katherine)
November 26, 2019 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Bryan Schroeder on 10/09/2019, filed by Alaska Center, Alaska Community Action On Toxics, Alaska Wilderness League, Cook Inletkeeper, Defenders of Wildlife, Friends of McNeil River, McNeil River Alliance, National Parks Conservation Association, National Wildlife Federation, SalmonState, Sierra Club, Wild Salmon Center. (Strong, Katherine)
November 26, 2019 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on U.S. Environmental Protection Agency on 10/09/2019, filed by Alaska Center, Alaska Community Action On Toxics, Alaska Wilderness League, Cook Inletkeeper, Defenders of Wildlife, Friends of McNeil River, McNeil River Alliance, National Parks Conservation Association, National Wildlife Federation, SalmonState, Sierra Club, Wild Salmon Center. (Strong, Katherine)
November 26, 2019 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Matthew Leopold on 10/09/2019, filed by Alaska Center, Alaska Community Action On Toxics, Alaska Wilderness League, Cook Inletkeeper, Defenders of Wildlife, Friends of McNeil River, McNeil River Alliance, National Parks Conservation Association, National Wildlife Federation, SalmonState, Sierra Club, Wild Salmon Center. (Strong, Katherine)
November 26, 2019 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Chris Hladick on 10/09/2019, filed by Alaska Center, Alaska Community Action On Toxics, Alaska Wilderness League, Cook Inletkeeper, Defenders of Wildlife, Friends of McNeil River, McNeil River Alliance, National Parks Conservation Association, National Wildlife Federation, SalmonState, Sierra Club, Wild Salmon Center. (Strong, Katherine)
November 26, 2019 Filing 29 Notice to Counsel re #28 Notice (Other) filed by Chris Hladick, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. A review of the document submitted at dkt 28 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a CHAMBERS copy of the document has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 5.4 and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a CHAMBERS copy of your filing at dkt 28. The CHAMBERS copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf footer on each page. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
November 22, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD INDEX by Chris Hladick, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency (Attachments: #1 Administrative Record Index)(Nitczynski, Mark)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: Agency Record and Responses to Complaints due 12/10/19. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 11/18/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
November 12, 2019 Filing 26 Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order by Bristol Bay Economic Development Corporation, Bristol Bay Native Association, Inc., Bristol Bay Regional Seafood Development Association, Inc., Bristol Bay Reserve Association, United Tribes of Bristol Bay re #23 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Feldman, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/13/2019 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR ENTRY OF SCHEDULING ORDER by Chris Hladick, Matthew Z. Leopold, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler re #24 Notice (Other), #23 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Nitczynski, Mark) Modified on 11/13/2019 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Errata by Bristol Bay Economic Development Corporation, Bristol Bay Native Association, Inc., Bristol Bay Regional Seafood Development Association, Inc., Bristol Bay Reserve Association, United Tribes of Bristol Bay re #23 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Feldman, Jeffrey)
November 6, 2019 Filing 23 Plaintiffs' Scheduling Conference Report and Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order/REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Feldman, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/13/2019 to clarify docket text and change to motion event (JLH, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Civil Cover Sheet served on Chris Hladick on October 16, 2019, filed by Trout Unlimited. (Werner, Paul)
October 25, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Civil Cover Sheet served on William Barr on October 15, 2019, filed by Trout Unlimited. (Werner, Paul)
October 25, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Civil Cover Sheet served on Matthew Z. Leopold on October 11, 2019, filed by Trout Unlimited. (Werner, Paul)
October 25, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Civil Cover Sheet served on Andrew Wheeler on October 11, 2019, filed by Trout Unlimited. (Werner, Paul)
October 25, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Civil Cover Sheet served on U.S. Environmental Protection Agency on October 11, 2019, filed by Trout Unlimited. (Werner, Paul)
October 25, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Civil Cover Sheet served on Bryan Schroder on October 11, 2019, filed by Trout Unlimited. (Werner, Paul)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO CONSOLIDATE: IT IS ORDERED that the motions to consolidate are both GRANTED. All further filings shall be made in Case No. 3:19-cv-00265-SLG, and the case caption for these consolidated cases is amended as set forth above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall promptly meet and confer to discuss scheduling matters. Counsel for Plaintiffs Bristol Bay Development, et al., shall file a proposed scheduling order within 14 days of the date of this order. Alternatively, the parties may file a notice that the provisions of Local Civil Rule 16.3 shall apply to this case. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/22/2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
October 22, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons (3), Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet served on U.S. Attorney General William P. Barr on 10/16/2019, filed by Bristol Bay Economic Development Corporation, Bristol Bay Native Association, Inc., Bristol Bay Regional Seafood Development Association, Inc., Bristol Bay Reserve Association, United Tribes of Bristol Bay. (Feldman, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet served on Defendant Matthew Z. Leopold on 10/15/2019, filed by Bristol Bay Economic Development Corporation, Bristol Bay Native Association, Inc., Bristol Bay Regional Seafood Development Association, Inc., Bristol Bay Reserve Association, United Tribes of Bristol Bay. (Feldman, Jeffrey)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bristol Bay Economic Development Corporation, Bristol Bay Native Association, Inc., Bristol Bay Regional Seafood Development Association, Inc., Bristol Bay Reserve Association, United Tribes of Bristol Bay on Defendant U.S. Environmental Protection Agency (Feldman, Jeffrey)
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet served on Chris Hladick on 10/11/2019, filed by Bristol Bay Economic Development Corporation, Bristol Bay Native Association, Inc., Bristol Bay Regional Seafood Development Association, Inc., Bristol Bay Reserve Association, United Tribes of Bristol Bay. (Feldman, Jeffrey)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE re #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lynn M. Engel, at docket #6 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (CME, COURT STAFF)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE re #5 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ralph H. Palumbo, at docket #5 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (CME, COURT STAFF)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 TMB TEXT ORDER: Chief Judge Timothy M. Burgess hereby recuses himself from the above-referenced case. By agreement of the judges, the above referenced case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Sharon L. Gleason for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:19-cv-00265-SLG. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
October 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE --Response by Bristol Bay Economic Development Corporation, Bristol Bay Native Association, Inc., Bristol Bay Reserve Association (Feldman, Jeffrey)
October 14, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet served on Bryan Schroder, US Attorney, Alaska District on 10/11/2019, filed by Bristol Bay Economic Development Corporation, Bristol Bay Native Association, Inc., Bristol Bay Regional Seafood Development Association, Inc., Bristol Bay Reserve Association, United Tribes of Bristol Bay. (Feldman, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Lynn M. Engel. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2769636.) by Bristol Bay Economic Development Corporation, Bristol Bay Native Association, Inc., Bristol Bay Reserve Association.(Palumbo, Ralph)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Ralph H. Palumbo. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2769630.) by Bristol Bay Economic Development Corporation, Bristol Bay Native Association, Inc., Bristol Bay Reserve Association.(Palumbo, Ralph)
October 8, 2019 Summons Issued as to Chris Hladick, Matthew Z. Leopold, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Chris Hladick (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Matthew Z. Leopold, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Environmental Protection Agency)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bristol Bay Economic Development Corporation, Bristol Bay Native Association, Inc., Bristol Bay Regional Seafood Development Association, Inc., Bristol Bay Reserve Association, United Tribes of Bristol Bay. (Feldman, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Feldman, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2769274.), filed by Bristol Bay Native Association, Inc., Bristol Bay Economic Development Corporation, Bristol Bay Reserve Association.(Feldman, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bristol Bay Economic Development Corporation et al v. Hladick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bristol Bay Reserve Association
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Feldman
Represented By: Ralph H. Palumbo
Represented By: Lynn M Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Tribes of Bristol Bay
Represented By: Megan Rachel Condon
Represented By: Matthew Neil Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bristol Bay Economic Development Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Feldman
Represented By: Ralph H. Palumbo
Represented By: Lynn M Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bristol Bay Regional Seafood Development Association, Inc.
Represented By: Scott M. Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bristol Bay Native Association, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Feldman
Represented By: Ralph H. Palumbo
Represented By: Lynn M Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cook Inletkeeper
Represented By: Katherine G. Strong
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wild Salmon Center
Represented By: Katherine G. Strong
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Parks Conservation Association
Represented By: Katherine G. Strong
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Wilderness League
Represented By: Katherine G. Strong
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McNeil River Alliance
Represented By: Katherine G. Strong
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Wildlife Federation
Represented By: Katherine G. Strong
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SalmonState
Represented By: Katherine G. Strong
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trout Unlimited
Represented By: Abraham J. Shanedling
Represented By: Paul Werner
Represented By: Steven P. Hollman
Represented By: Austin E. Williams
Represented By: Rachelle Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Community Action On Toxics
Represented By: Katherine G. Strong
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earthworks
Represented By: Thomas S. Waldo
Represented By: Erin Whalen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Center
Represented By: Katherine G. Strong
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of McNeil River
Represented By: Katherine G. Strong
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Katherine G. Strong
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Katherine G. Strong
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Jacqueline Miya Iwata
Represented By: Joel Robert Reynolds
Represented By: Thomas David Zimpleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Richard L. Pomeroy
Represented By: Mark A. Nitczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Hladick
Represented By: Richard L. Pomeroy
Represented By: Mark A. Nitczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Z. Leopold
Represented By: Richard L. Pomeroy
Represented By: Mark A. Nitczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wheeler
Represented By: Richard L. Pomeroy
Represented By: Mark A. Nitczynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?