Alaska Public Entity Insurance v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg PA et al
Plaintiff: Alaska Public Entity Insurance
Defendant: Kris Ann Cappelutti and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg PA
Case Number: 3:2019cv00271
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 10/22/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 11, 2019 Summons Issued as to Kris Ann Cappelutti, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg PA. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 10, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant National Union)(KMC, COURT STAFF)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (KMC, COURT STAFF)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg PA, Kris Ann Cappelutti (Filing fee $ 400. Paid. Receipt #ANC016233 ), filed by Alaska Public Entity Insurance.(KMC, COURT STAFF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2019: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (PXS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/11/2019 to add attachments and regenerated NEF (PXS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 [PLEASE DISREGARD]Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/11/2019 to please disregard filing made in incorrect case. (PXS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alaska Public Entity Insurance v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg PA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris Ann Cappelutti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburg PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Public Entity Insurance
Represented By: Alfred T. Clayton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?