Robinson-Sweat v. Blackburn et al
Plaintiff: Angela D. Robinson-Sweat
Defendant: Harlan W. Blackburn and Alaska Rent-A-Car, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00275
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 11 Witness List by Harlan W. Blackburn. (Rankin, Christina)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/16/2019. Discovery due by 11/6/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 12/16/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/31/2020. See PDF document for all other deadlines. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 12/9/19. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Rayburn, Mark)
October 29, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Harlan W. Blackburn (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(Rankin, Christina)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Harlan W. Blackburn (Rankin, Christina)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Harlan W. Blackburn.(Rankin, Christina)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Harlan W. Blackburn re #1 Notice of Removal, (Rankin, Christina)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Rankin, Christina)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Harlan W. Blackburn from District Court, case number 3AN-19-09696CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2775359), filed by Harlan W. Blackburn. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint, #2 Order Granting Dismissal Prior to Answer, #3 State Notice of Removal)(Rankin, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson-Sweat v. Blackburn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela D. Robinson-Sweat
Represented By: Mark D. Rayburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harlan W. Blackburn
Represented By: Christina A. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Rent-A-Car, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?