Alexander v. Foss Maritime Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Alexander
Defendant: HDR Marine LLC, Emmett Foss and Foss Maritime Company LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00276
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 19 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-00370. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Defendants' Foss Maritime and HDR Marine's unopposed #16 Motion to Transfer Venue. This matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Alaska for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. The Clerk transferred this case to the District of Alaska by electronic case transfer. (PM) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/21/2019.]
September 19, 2019 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) Transfer Venue (Urie, Anthony) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/21/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION Transfer Venue , filed by Defendant Foss Maritime Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Declaration of Heather Ronek, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/11/2019, (Whitehead, James) Modified on 9/18/2019 (PM). [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/21/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert L Richmond for defendants Foss Maritime Company LLC and HDR Marine LLC, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/21/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert L. Richmond FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Foss Maritime Company LLC, HDR Marine LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5830488 (Whitehead, James) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/21/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *5 days*. Bench Trial is set for 5/4/2020 at 9:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 11/6/2019, Motions due by 12/6/2019, Discovery completed by 1/6/2020, Dispositive motions due by 2/4/2020, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 3/20/2020, Motions in Limine due by 4/6/2020, Pretrial Order due by 4/22/2020, Trial briefs to be submitted by 4/29/2020, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 4/29/2020. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/21/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 5. Filed by Defendants Foss Maritime Company LLC, HDR Marine LLC.(Whitehead, James) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/21/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by HDR Marine LLC (Whitehead, James) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/21/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Foss Maritime Company LLC (Whitehead, James) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/21/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report: Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 6/14/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(MW) (Main Document 9 replaced on 5/15/2019) (MW). [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/21/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Answer by Foss Maritime Company LLC, HDR Marine LLC.(Whitehead, James) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/21/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE, by Defendants Foss Maritime Company LLC, HDR Marine LLC, to #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report. (Whitehead, James) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/21/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report, filed by Plaintiff Gregory Alexander. Noting Date 5/24/2019, (Webb, Gordon) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/21/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James F Whitehead, III on behalf of Defendant HDR Marine LLC. (Whitehead, James) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/21/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney James F Whitehead, III on behalf of Defendant Foss Maritime Company LLC. (Whitehead, James) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/21/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 5/3/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/19/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/26/2019, by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (LW) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/21/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Foss Maritime Company LLC, HDR Marine LLC (SNP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/21/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (SNP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/21/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Alexander Gregory with JURY DEMAND, filed by Alexander Gregory Gregory Alexander. Attorney Anthony Martin Urie added to party Alexander Gregory Gregory Alexander(pty:pla)(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Urie, Anthony) (Fee Waived) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/14/2019) (SNP). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/14/2019) (SNP). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2019: #2 Summons) (SNP). Modified on 3/14/2019 to correct fee status and plaintiff's name (SNP). [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Foss Maritime Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Alexander
Represented By: Anthony Martin Urie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HDR Marine LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Richmond
Represented By: James F. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emmett Foss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foss Maritime Company LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Richmond
Represented By: James F. Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?