Shangin et al v. Carlson et al
Plaintiff: Denise Bereskin, Fred Shangin, Michael Enright and Cecil Kalmakoff
Defendant: Dale L. Carlson and F/V TAJAHA, USCG ID Number 644238
Case Number: 3:2019cv00299
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Referring Judge: Deborah M Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and more served on Dale L. Carlson on 1/8/2020, filed by Denise Bereskin, Michael Enright, Cecil Kalmakoff, Fred Shangin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Schneider, Michael)
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Schneider, Michael)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DMS TEXT ORDER re #6 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint in Rem for Unpaid Wages: Rule 15 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure permits a party to amend its pleading once as a matter of course within 21 days of serving it. Plaintiffs filed their verified complaint in rem for unpaid wages on November 21, 2019. No proof of service has been filed with the Court and plaintiffs' counsel asserts in the motion that service has not been perfected. In light of this, the plaintiffs' #6 motion to amend/correct their complaint is hereby GRANTED. Proof of service of the First Amended Complaint should be filed with the Court. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 01/03/2020. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF)
December 30, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint in Rem for Unpaid Wages by Denise Bereskin, Michael Enright, Fred Shangin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Schneider, Michael) Modified on 1/10/2020 to term motion per order at 7 (BJK, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem and Hold Process in Abeyance. It is ORDERED that the Clerk shall hold the issuance of the arrest warrant of the defendant vessel in abeyance until plaintiff files a subsequent written request to issue process on the defendant vessel. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 11/26/2019. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF)
November 21, 2019 Summons Issued as to Dale L. Carlson. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Dale L. Carlson (PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Issue Warrant and Hold Process in Abeyance re: F/V TAJAHA USCG ID No. 644238 by Denise Bereskin, Michael Enright, Fred Shangin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed In Rem Arrest Warrant)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN REM FOR UNPAID WAGES against Dale L. Carlson, F/V TAJAHA, USCG ID Number 644238, filed by Fred Shangin, Denise Bereskin, Michael Enright.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shangin et al v. Carlson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Bereskin
Represented By: Michael J. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Shangin
Represented By: Michael J. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Enright
Represented By: Michael J. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil Kalmakoff
Represented By: Michael J. Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale L. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V TAJAHA, USCG ID Number 644238
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?