Cook Inlet Tribal Council, Inc. v. United Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Cook Inlet Tribal Council, Inc.
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00301
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE by United Specialty Insurance Company (Wilhelm, Marc)
January 9, 2020 Filing 12 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
January 2, 2020 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by United Specialty Insurance Company. (Wilhelm, Marc)
January 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Gerhard Wilhelm on behalf of United Specialty Insurance Company (Wilhelm, Marc)
January 2, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United Specialty Insurance Company.(Wilhelm, Marc)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE re #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Greg D. Pendleton, at docket #3 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (SDW, COURT STAFF)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE re #2 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Dale L. Kingman, at docket #2 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (SDW, COURT STAFF)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cook Inlet Tribal Council, Inc.. (Gronning, Chris)
November 25, 2019 Summons Issued as to United Specialty Insurance Company. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 Unissued summons re Defendant United Specialty Insurance Company. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet. (Gronning, Chris)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Greg D. Pendleton. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2793601.) by Cook Inlet Tribal Council, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gronning, Chris)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Dale L. Kingman. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2793595.) by Cook Inlet Tribal Council, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gronning, Chris)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY REIEF AND DAMAGES; JURY DEMAND against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2793584.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhiibit 1)(Gronning, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook Inlet Tribal Council, Inc. v. United Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Marc Gerhard Wilhelm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cook Inlet Tribal Council, Inc.
Represented By: Chris D. Gronning
Represented By: Greg D. Pendleton
Represented By: Dale L. Kingman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?