Tomelleri v. Kendall Brough
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Tomelleri
Defendant: Kendall Brough
Case Number: 3:2019cv00310
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kendall Brough.(Zahare, A.)
January 22, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE re #8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott Joseph Strohm, at docket #8 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 17, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Scott Joseph Strohm. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2819124.) by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MO Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit W.D. MO Certificate of Good Standing)(Strohm, Scott)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 1/15/20. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling and Planning Conference Report)(JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Michael Zahare on behalf of Kendall Brough (Zahare, A.)
December 24, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Kendall Brough on 12/18/2019, filed by Joseph R. Tomelleri. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Green Card)(Gross, David)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the filing or determination of an action for appeal regarding a copyright. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 6, 2019 Summons Issued as to Kendall Brough. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Kendall Brough, (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Jury Trial Demanded against Kendall Brough (Filing fee $400/receipt #ANC016418.), filed by Joseph R. Tomelleri.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomelleri v. Kendall Brough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Tomelleri
Represented By: David Karl Gross
Represented By: Scott Joseph Strohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendall Brough
Represented By: A. Michael Zahare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?