Blas
Appellant: Leo Blas
Trustee: Nacole M Jipping, Kenneth W. Battley and Office of the U.S. Trustee-Alaska
Appellee: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00325
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Referring Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 Clerk's Certificate of Readiness (Attachments: #1 1 Part 1 DE# 1 - DE# 54, #2 1 Part 2 DE# 1 - DE# 54, #3 1 Part 3 DE# 1 - DE# 54, #4 1 Part 4 DE# 1 - DE# 54, #5 DE# 55 - DE# 74, #6 DE# 81 - DE# 181, #7 DE# 182 - DE# 280, #8 DE# 288)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 14, 2020 Filing 6 TMB TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. By agreement of the judges, the above referenced case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Ralph R. Beistline for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:19-cv-00325-RRB. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE OF USDC APPEAL NUMBER (RMC, COURT STAFF)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Leo Blas. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF USDC APPEAL NUMBER. cc: Bankruptcy Court. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 Application to Proceed without Pre-Paying Fee by Leo Blas.(LMH, COURT STAFF)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number A17-00411. File received, filed by Leo Blas. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal, #2 Notice of Requirements, #3 Transmittal of Appeal)(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Leo Blas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Nacole M Jipping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Kenneth W. Battley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee-Alaska
Represented By: Kathryn Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Michael W. Seville
Represented By: Cynthia Lowery-Graber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?