Tuia v. Municipality of Anchorage et al
Plaintiff: Jared Tuia
Defendant: Anchorage Police Department and Municipality of Anchorage
Case Number: 3:2019cv00326
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Referring Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by All Defendants (Botstein, Ruth)
February 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B, #3 Attachment C, #4 Attachment D, #5 Attachment E)(Botstein, Ruth)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re State Court Documents. Defendants shall comply with the Order at docket #3 on or before 2/21/2020. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Fact Discovery closes 5/4/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 6/4/2021. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 2/3/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 27, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Botstein, Ruth)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 1/8/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 TMB TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Timothy M. Burgess hereby recuses himself from the above-referenced case. Pursuant to the system of random case assignments, this action is reassigned to Senior Judge H. Russel Holland for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:19-cv-00326-HRH. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
December 31, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Carmichael, Meagan)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Meagan Rae Carmichael on behalf of All Defendants (Carmichael, Meagan)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jared Tuia, Municipality of Anchorage from State of Alaska Third Judicial District, case number 3AN-19-10807 CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 ANC016483), filed by Jared Tuna, Municipality of Anchorage. (Attachments: #1 Notice to State Court, #2 Original complaint)(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tuia v. Municipality of Anchorage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Tuia
Represented By: Michael W. Flanigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchorage Police Department
Represented By: Meagan Rae Carmichael
Represented By: Ruth Botstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipality of Anchorage
Represented By: Meagan Rae Carmichael
Represented By: Ruth Botstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?