Oertwich v. City of Togiak et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Oertwich
Defendant: City of Togiak, Teodoro Paulk and Teodoro Pauk
Case Number: 3:2020cv00018
Filed: January 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Referring Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Filing 19 JUDGMENT as to Defendant Teodoro Pauk: Defendants motion at docket #7 is GRANTED. All claims against Pauk are dismissed. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 3/9/2020. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
March 23, 2020 Filing 18 City of Togiak's ANSWER to Complaint by City of Togiak.(Slottee, Christopher)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/13/2020. Discovery due by 2/19/2021. Joinder of Parties due by 5/13/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/1/2021. See order for all other deadlines. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 3/12/2020. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER AND OPINION: Defendants motion at docket #7 isGRANTED. All claims against Pauk are dismissed. The claims for punitive damages and injunctive relief against the City are dismissed. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 3/9/2020. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
February 24, 2020 Filing 15 JWS TEXT ORDER re #9 MOTION Judicial Notice re 8 Memorandum, 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. The motion for judicial notice at docket 9 has not been opposed. Upon review, the motion is found to have merit. The motion at docket 9 is GRANTED. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF) Modified on 3/3/2020 Create relationship to document #7. (SDW, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2020 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Slottee, Christopher)
February 18, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by City of Togiak, Teodoro Paulk (Attachments: #1 State Court Summons to City of Togiak, #2 State Court Summons to Pauk)(Slottee, Christopher)
February 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by City of Togiak, Teodoro Paulk (Slottee, Christopher)
February 6, 2020 Filing 11 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Request for Common Judicial Assignment, at docket #10 , is hereby GRANTED. By agreement of the Judges, this case is reassigned to the Honorable John W. Sedwick for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:20-cv-00018-JWS. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Related Case and Request for Common Judicial Assignment by City of Togiak, Teodoro Paulk (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Slottee, Christopher) Modified on 2/5/2020 to change to motion event (JLH, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION Judicial Notice re #8 Memorandum, #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Togiak, Teodoro Paulk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Slottee, Christopher)
February 3, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of Togiak, Teodoro Paulk #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Teodoro Paulk, City of Togiak. (Slottee, Christopher)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Togiak, Teodoro Paulk.(Slottee, Christopher)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 1/30/20. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling and Planning Conference Report)(JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 29, 2020 Docket Annotation re #1 Complaint: Parties to disregard this entry as it was docketed in error. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Removal to Adverse Party by City of Togiak, Teodoro Paulk (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Slottee, Christopher)
January 28, 2020 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet (KMC, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Togiak and Teodoro Pauk from District/Superior Court for the State of Alaska at Kenai, case number 3KN1901033CI. (Filing fee $ 400/Receipt ANC016555) (KMC, COURT STAFF) Modified on 1/29/2020 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2020: #1 Complaint) (JLH, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2020 Filing 1 *DISREGARD ENTRY * COMPLAINT against City of Togiak, Teodoro Paulk (Filing fee $ 400/Receipt ANC016555), filed by Ronald Oertwich.(KMC, COURT STAFF) Modified on 1/29/2020 to indicate error. See 1/29/2020 Docket Annotation (JLH, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oertwich v. City of Togiak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Togiak
Represented By: Matthew Singer
Represented By: Christopher J. Slottee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teodoro Paulk
Represented By: Matthew Singer
Represented By: Christopher J. Slottee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teodoro Pauk
Represented By: Matthew Singer
Represented By: Christopher J. Slottee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Oertwich
Represented By: Andy L. Pevehouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?