Holan v. Card et al
Plaintiff: John Holan
Defendant: John Vandervalk, Taylor Winston and Larry Card
Case Number: 3:2020cv00038
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Referring Judge: Joshua M Kindred
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by John Holan as to Larry Card. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 16, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by John Holan as to John Vandervalk. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 16, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by John Holan as to Taylor Winston. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF STAY; case stayed until 5/1/2020. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 4/8/20. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 TMB TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. By agreement of the judges, the above referenced case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Joshua M. Kindred for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:20-cv-00038-JMK. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by John Holan.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by John Holan (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2020 Summons Issued as to Larry Card, John Vandervalk, Taylor Winston. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Larry Card, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Taylor Winston, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant John Vandervalk)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Larry Card, John Vandervalk, Taylor Winston (Filing fee $ 400/receipt #ANC016630.), filed by John Holan.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holan v. Card et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Holan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Vandervalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Card
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?