Mabry v. Conocophillips Alaska et al
Plaintiff: Monte Mabry
Defendant: Conocophillips Retirement Plan and Conocophillips Alaska
Case Number: 3:2020cv00039
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Teresa Susan Renaker (Renaker, Teresa)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident) Attorney using Pay.gov at docket #9 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint at docket #10 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file amended complaint on or April 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 3/20/2020. (CFR, Chambers Staff)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Monte Mabry. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Renaker, Teresa)
March 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Teresa S. Renaker. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2848770.) by Monte Mabry.(Renaker, Teresa)
March 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE REGARDING MOTION TO DISMISS re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Conocophillips Retirement Plan, Conocophillips Alaska (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Conocophillips Alaska, Conocophillips Retirement Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Teig, Joe)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6)(Teig, Joe)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by All Defendants (Teig, Joe)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Conocophillips Alaska, Conocophillips Retirement Plan. (Teig, Joe)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Teig, Joe)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Alaska Superior Court, case number 3AN-20-4604 CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2835482), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Teig, Joe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mabry v. Conocophillips Alaska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conocophillips Retirement Plan
Represented By: Joe Myron Teig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conocophillips Alaska
Represented By: Joe Myron Teig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monte Mabry
Represented By: Teresa Susan Renaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?