Turner v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sherri Turner
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00059
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Colbo, Kimberlee)
March 11, 2020 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Colbo, Kimberlee)
March 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberlee A. Colbo on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Colbo, Kimberlee)
March 10, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Colbo, Kimberlee)
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Colbo, Kimberlee)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from State of Alaska Third Judicial District, case number 3pa-19-02292 CI. ( Filing fee $ 400-Receipt #ANC016699), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/9/2020: #5 Exhibit) (LMH, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Kimberlee A. Colbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Turner
Represented By: Curtis W. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?