Geico Indemnity Company v. Umialik Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Company
Defendant: Umialik Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00073
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Umialik Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Walker, Stacy)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Umialik Insurance Company (Walker, Stacy)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Walker, Stacy)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Alaska Superior Court, case number 3AN-20-05181CI. ( Filing fee $400/Receipt 097--2855544), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint)(Walker, Stacy) Modified on 3/25/2020 to add payment info.(PXS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geico Indemnity Company v. Umialik Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Umialik Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory R. Henrikson
Represented By: Stacy Lee Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Barry J. Kell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?