Woods v. Alaska State Employees Assocation/AFSCME Local 52, AFL-CIO(ASEA) et al
Plaintiff: Christopher A Woods
Defendant: Alaska State Employees Assoc/AFSCME Local 52, AFL-CIO(ASEA), Kelly Tshibaka and Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52, AFL-CIO(ASEA)
Case Number: 3:2020cv00074
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Alyssa K. Hazelwood. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2881903.) by Christopher A Woods.(Hazelwood, Alyssa)
May 26, 2020 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE re #24 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William S. Consovoy, at docket #24 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 26, 2020 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE re #23 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Michael Connolly, at docket #23 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 26, 2020 Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE re #25 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Steven Christopher Begakis, at docket #25 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 22, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Steven C. Begakis. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2880474.) by Kelly Tshibaka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Standing)(Begakis, Steven)
May 22, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney William S. Consovoy. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2880469.) by Kelly Tshibaka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jurisdiction List, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Standing)(Consovoy, William)
May 22, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney J. Michael Connolly. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2880438.) by Kelly Tshibaka. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jurisdiction List, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Standing)(Connolly, John)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 5/18/20. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling and Planning Conference Report)(JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 15, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Andrew Higgins on behalf of Kelly Tshibaka (Higgins, Kevin)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52, AFL-CIO(ASEA) answer due 6/4/2020. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 21, 2020 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE re #15 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stefanie L. Wilson, at docket #15 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 21, 2020 Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE re #13 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott A. Kronland, at docket #13 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 21, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE re #11 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew J. Murray, at docket #11 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 21, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Stefanie L. Wilson re #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Stefanie L. Wilson. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2867079.) by Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52, AFL-CIO(ASEA). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jurisdictions Admitted, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Brown, Molly)
April 21, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Stefanie L. Wilson. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2867079.) by Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52, AFL-CIO(ASEA).(Brown, Molly)
April 21, 2020 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Scott A. Kronland re #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Scott A. Kronland. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2867041.) by Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52, AFL-CIO(ASEA). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jurisdictions Admitted, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Brown, Molly)
April 21, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Scott A. Kronland. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2867041.) by Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52, AFL-CIO(ASEA).(Brown, Molly)
April 21, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Matthew J. Murray re #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Matthew J. Murray. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2867027.) by Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52, AFL-CIO(ASEA). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jurisdictions Admitted, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing)(Brown, Molly)
April 21, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Matthew J. Murray. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2867027.) by Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52, AFL-CIO(ASEA).(Brown, Molly)
April 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (UNOPPOSED motion for extension) by Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52, AFL-CIO(ASEA). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Molly)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 4/20/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Molly C. Brown on behalf of Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52, AFL-CIO(ASEA) (Brown, Molly)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney William Messenger. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2861446.) by Christopher A Woods.(Messenger, William)
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney W. James Young. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2859243.) by Christopher A Woods.(Young, W.)
April 1, 2020 Summons Issued as to Alaska State Employees Assoc/AFSCME Local 52, AFL-CIO(ASEA), Kelly Tshibaka. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Tshibaka, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Local 52)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Young, W.)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified, Class Action against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2858402.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Young, W.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Alaska State Employees Assocation/AFSCME Local 52, AFL-CIO(ASEA) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska State Employees Assoc/AFSCME Local 52, AFL-CIO(ASEA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Tshibaka
Represented By: John Michael Connolly
Represented By: William S. Consovoy
Represented By: Steven Christopher Begakis
Represented By: Kevin Andrew Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska State Employees Association/AFSCME Local 52, AFL-CIO(ASEA)
Represented By: Stefanie L. Wilson
Represented By: Scott A. Kronland
Represented By: Matthew J. Murray
Represented By: Molly C. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher A Woods
Represented By: W. James Young
Represented By: William L. Messenger
Represented By: Alyssa Kristine Hazelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?