Jenkins v. Richardson
Plaintiff: Robert Jenkins
Defendant: Russell Richardson
Case Number: 3:2020cv00086
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Fact Discovery closes 2/12/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/3/2021. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 6/12/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bowman, Timothy)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re Conference Report Deadline. Parties to file their scheduling and planning conference report by 6/5/2020. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Russell Richardson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Rule 4 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit D - NOA, #5 Exhibit E - Jury Demand, #6 Exhibit F - Not. of Change of Atty of Record, #7 Exhibit G - Notice of Removal)(Bowman, Timothy)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Bowman, Timothy)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 4/20/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/22/2020: #1 Scheduling and Planning Conference Report) (JLH, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/22/2020 to add attachment (JLH, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by All Defendants (Bowman, Timothy)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowman, Timothy)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Russell Richardson from Superior Court, Third Judicial District Anchorage, Alaska, case number 3AN-20-05501 CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2865334) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Complaint))(Bowman, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jenkins v. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Richardson
Represented By: Timothy W. Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jenkins
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?