Hedlund v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Grace Hedlund
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00093
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Notice of Settlement Negotiations. Closing papers or joint status report due 7/8/2020. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COURT RE SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS by Grace Hedlund (Libbey, Colleen)
May 8, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Farley, Laura)
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Farley, Laura)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING AND PLANNING REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report as soon as possible, but not later than 6/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling and Planning Conference Report)(JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Farley, Laura)
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Farley, Laura)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Farley, Laura)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Superior Anchorage, case number 3AN-19-11348 CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2868119), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Farley, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hedlund v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura L. Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Hedlund
Represented By: Colleen Ann Libbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?