Wild Alaska Salmon and Seafood, Inc v. Wild Alaskan, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Wild Alaska Salmon and Seafood, Inc
Defendant: Arron Kallenberg and Wild Alaskan, Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00094
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE re #19 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brad R. Maurer, at docket #19 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (SDW, COURT STAFF)
June 16, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Brad R. Maurer. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2891143.) by Wild Alaska Salmon and Seafood, Inc.(Maurer, Brad)
June 8, 2020 Summons Issued as to Wild Alaska Salmon and Seafood, Inc. and Anthony Wood. (KMC, COURT STAFF)
June 8, 2020 Filing 18 Unissued summons re Defendant Wild Alaska Salmon & Seafood, Inc, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Anthony Wood)(KMC, COURT STAFF)
June 5, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Mara Elizabeth Michaletz on behalf of Wild Alaskan, Inc (Michaletz, Mara)
June 5, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wild Alaskan, Inc. (Gross, David)
June 5, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Wild Alaska Salmon and Seafood, Inc, Anthony Wood by Wild Alaskan, Inc.(Gross, David)
June 5, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by David Karl Gross on behalf of Wild Alaskan, Inc (Gross, David)
May 22, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE re #12 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James M. Hinshaw, at docket #12 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (SDW, COURT STAFF)
May 22, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney James M. Hinshaw. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2880388.) by Wild Alaska Salmon and Seafood, Inc.(Hinshaw, James)
May 21, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE re #10 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew M. Pendexter, at docket #10 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (SDW, COURT STAFF)
May 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Andrew M. Pendexter. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2880054.) by Wild Alaska Salmon and Seafood, Inc.(Pendexter, Andrew)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint, Demand for Jury Trial and Civil Cover Sheet served on Amy McClaren, Agent, Wild Alaskan, Inc. c/o Business Filings Incorporated on May 15, 2020, filed by Wild Alaska Salmon and Seafood, Inc. (Wilhelm, Marc)
May 11, 2020 Summons Reissued as to Wild Alaskan, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 11, 2020 Filing 8 Unissued Summons as to Wild Alaskan, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 5/11/2020 to indicate summons unissued (PXS, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2020 Summons Reissued as to Arron Kallenberg and Wild Alaskan, Inc. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 5, 2020 Filing 7 Unissued summons re Defendant A. Kallenberg, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Wild Alaskan, Inc)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 5/5/2020. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
April 27, 2020 Docket Annotation: The parties are advised that the filing at docket #3 Unissued Summons is a duplicate filing to the one at docket #5 and should be disregarded as duplicate. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
April 27, 2020 Summons Issued as to Arron Kallenberg, Wild Alaskan, Inc. (KMC, COURT STAFF)
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 Unissued summons re Defendant Arron Kallenberg, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Wild Alaskan, Inc)(KMC, COURT STAFF)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wild Alaska Salmon and Seafood, Inc (Richmond, Robert)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Wild Alaskan, Inc, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Arron Kallenberg)(KMC, COURT STAFF)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (KMC, COURT STAFF)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arron Kallenberg, Wild Alaskan, Inc (Filing fee $ 400. Paid. Receipt #ANC016800), filed by Wild Alaska Salmon and Seafood, Inc.(KMC, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wild Alaska Salmon and Seafood, Inc v. Wild Alaskan, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wild Alaska Salmon and Seafood, Inc
Represented By: Robert L. Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arron Kallenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wild Alaskan, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?