Brewer v. Brennan et al
Plaintiff: Daniel McCook Brewer
Defendant: Federal Office of Worker's Compensation, Megan J. Brennan, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission and Office of Federal Operation, of E.E.O.C.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00096
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due within 30 days. Should Mr. Brewer fail to respond to this Order within 30 days, the Court shall consolidate this case with Brewer v. Brennan, Case No. 3:18-cv-170-TMB, and proceed under the current scheduling order at Docket 33. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 6/17/20. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF STAY. Case stayed until June 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 5/4/2020. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 SLG TEXT ORDER: By agreement of the judges, the above referenced case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Timothy M. Burgess for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:20-cv-00096-TMB. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel McCook Brewer.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Megan J. Brennan, Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Federal Office of Worker's Compensation, Office of Federal Operation, of E.E.O.C., filed by Daniel McCook Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Claims, #2 Statement of Relief)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. Brennan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Office of Worker's Compensation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Federal Operation, of E.E.O.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel McCook Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?