Tejada v. State of Alaska Department of Correction
Petitioner: Alex Tejada
Respondent: State of Alaska Department of Correction
Case Number: 3:2020cv00102
Filed: May 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Petition (UNOPPOSED) by Alex Tejada. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Poulson, Daniel)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Poulson on behalf of Alex Tejada (Poulson, Daniel)
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Motion to Appoint Counsel, at docket #3 , is hereby GRANTED. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthias Cicotte on behalf of State of Alaska Department of Correction (Cicotte, Matthias)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Alex Tejada. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Alex Tejada. (LMH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 5/21/2020 deleted Financial affidavit to be filed on it's own (LMH, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REGARDING SECTION 2241 PROCEEDING: The matter will not be referred to a Magistrate Judge. Request for court-appointed counsel or Notice of Intent to Proceed Without Counsel due within 30 days. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 5/8/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 7, 2020 Filing fee: $5, receipt number ANC016838 (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 1, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus 28:2241, filed by Alex Tejada. (Attachments: #1 Attachment for grounds for your challange in this petition, #2 State Court Documents)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tejada v. State of Alaska Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alex Tejada
Represented By: Daniel Poulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Alaska Department of Correction
Represented By: Matthias Cicotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?