Washington v. Corporation Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Later-Day Saints et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia V Washington
Defendant: Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and Courtney Willden
Case Number: 3:2020cv00105
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 10/28/2021 at 03:00 PM. Trial by Jury is scheduled for 11/8/2021 at 09:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 3 before Sharon L. Gleason. See order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 6/24/2020. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF) Modified on 6/25/2020 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Fact Discovery closes 5/31/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2021. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 6/23/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 18, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Colbo, Kimberlee)
June 8, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Courtney Willden. (Colbo, Kimberlee)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 6/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling and Planning Conference Report) (CFR, Chambers Staff)
May 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Colbo, Kimberlee)
May 21, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Colbo, Kimberlee)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Stipulation Amending Caption. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 5/20/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION Amending Caption, Unopposed by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Courtney Willden.(Colbo, Kimberlee)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by All Defendants (Colbo, Kimberlee)
May 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberlee A. Colbo on behalf of Courtney Willden (Colbo, Kimberlee) Modified on 5/7/2020 to correct defendant.(BJK, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Courtney Willden from Superior Court for the State of Alaska, case number 3AN-20-05897 CI. ( Filing fee $400/Receipt #ANC016834), filed by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Courtney Willden. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Courtney Willden, #3 Summson Corporation Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Later-Day Saints, #4 Notice of Service of Process, #5 Notice of Removal of Civil Action)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Corporation Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Later-Day Saints et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia V Washington
Represented By: David W. Murrills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints
Represented By: Kimberlee A. Colbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Willden
Represented By: Kimberlee A. Colbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?