Samson Tug and Barge Co., Inc et al v. International Longshore and Warehouse Union et al
Plaintiff: Marine Engineers' Beneficial, AFL-CIO and Samson Tug and Barge Co., Inc
Defendant: International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Alaska Longshore Division and ILWU Unit 222
Case Number: 3:2020cv00108
Filed: May 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE re #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew J. Palma, at docket #6 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JDS, COURT STAFF)
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE re #5 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Emily M. Maglio, at docket #5 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JDS, COURT STAFF)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 TMB TEXT ORDER GRANTING #7 Joint Stipulation to Extend Time for Respondents to Respond to Petition to Vacate Arbitration Decision and Waiver of Service. Respondents shall file their answer, motion, and/or response to the Petition on or before July 22, 2020. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 Joint STIPULATION to Extend Time for Respondents to Respond to Petition to Vacate Arbitration Decision and Waiver of Service by ILWU Unit 222, International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Alaska Longshore Division. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Josephson, Sarah)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Andrew J. Palma. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2892831.) by ILWU Unit 222, International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Alaska Longshore Division.(Josephson, Sarah)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Emily M. Maglio. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2892824.) by ILWU Unit 222, International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Alaska Longshore Division.(Josephson, Sarah)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah E. Josephson on behalf of ILWU Unit 222, International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Alaska Longshore Division (Josephson, Sarah)
May 13, 2020 Summons Issued as to ILWU Unit 222, International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Alaska Longshore Division. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Alaska Longshore Division, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Unit 222)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Royce, William)
May 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition to Vacate Arbitration Decision against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2875666.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Royce, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samson Tug and Barge Co., Inc et al v. International Longshore and Warehouse Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Alaska Longshore Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ILWU Unit 222
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marine Engineers' Beneficial, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Joseph W Geldhof
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samson Tug and Barge Co., Inc
Represented By: William G. Royce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?