Clark v. Government Employees Insurance Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Beverly Clark
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00113
Filed: May 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Government Employees Insurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Colbo, Kimberlee)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Government Employees Insurance Company, Inc..(Colbo, Kimberlee)
May 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Government Employees Insurance Company, Inc. (Colbo, Kimberlee)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 15, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Government Employees Insurance Company, Inc. from State of Alaska, Third Judicial District of Anchorage, case number 3AN-20-05778 CI. ( Filing fee $400/Receipt #ANC016860), filed by Government EmployeesInsurance Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint, #2 Summons and Notice to Both Parties, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Notice of Removal of Civil Action)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Government Employees Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberlee A. Colbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Clark
Represented By: Evan A. Barrickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?