Alaska Libertarian Party et al v. Fenumiai et al
Plaintiff: Alaska Libertarian Party and Jon Watts
Defendant: Gail Fenumiai and Kevin Meyer
Case Number: 3:2020cv00127
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Dismissal without prejudice under FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Alaska Libertarian Party, Jon Watts (Wiest, Christopher)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
July 8, 2020 Filing 16 ERRATA by Gail Fenumiai #11 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Gail Fenumiai. (Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
July 3, 2020 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Scott Kohlhaas (supplemental with signature gathering update) re #14 Reply to Response to Motion by Alaska Libertarian Party, Jon Watts. (Wiest, Christopher)
July 3, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Expedited consideration requested) filed by Alaska Libertarian Party, Jon Watts. (Wiest, Christopher)
June 30, 2020 Filing 13 JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. When plaintiffs file their reply in support of their emergency motion at docket 5, they shall include as an exhibit a report advising the court about their signature gathering efforts. The report shall focus on the period of time beginning on the date the motion at docket 5 was filed thru the date the reply is filed. The report shall list the number of persons engaged in collecting signatures each day, the city or town where each such person gathered signatures each day, and the aggregate number of signatures obtained each day. The report shall also state how many signatures have been obtained by electronic means. The report shall advise the total number of all signatures obtained to the date the reply is filed including those obtained before filing the motion at docket 5. Finally, the report shall state how many persons will continue to gather signatures. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
June 29, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Gail Fenumiai re #11 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Gail Fenumiai. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Expedited consideration requested) Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Cross-Motion to Dismiss filed by Gail Fenumiai. (Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alaska Libertarian Party. (Amodio, Thomas) Modified on 6/24/2020 to Create relationship to document #9. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
June 16, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alaska Libertarian Party. Gail Fenumiai served on 6/10/2020, answer due 7/1/2020. (Amodio, Thomas)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alaska Libertarian Party. Kevin Meyer served on 6/10/2020, answer due 7/1/2020. (Amodio, Thomas)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 JUDGE SEDWICK ORDER re #6 Motion to Expedite. The motion to expedite at docket 6 is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to plaintiffs' motion at docket 5 for injunctive relief no later than June 29, 2020. Plaintiffs may file a reply no later than July 7, 2020. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite consideration of DN 5, Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Alaska Libertarian Party, Jon Watts. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of C. Wiest, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wiest, Christopher)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Expedited consideration requested) by Alaska Libertarian Party, Jon Watts. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kohlhaas, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wiest, Christopher)
June 7, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #2 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christoper Wiest, at docket #2 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (SDW, COURT STAFF)
June 5, 2020 Summons Issued as to Gail Fenumiai and Kevin Meyer. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant G. Fenumiai, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant K. Meyer)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Christopher D Wiest. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2885295.) by Alaska Libertarian Party, Jon Watts.(Wiest, Christopher)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Jon Watts, Alaska Libertarian Party ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2885277.), filed by Jon Watts, Alaska Libertarian Party. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Amodio, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alaska Libertarian Party et al v. Fenumiai et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Fenumiai
Represented By: Margaret A. Paton-Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Meyer
Represented By: Margaret A. Paton-Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Libertarian Party
Represented By: Thomas P. Amodio
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Watts
Represented By: Thomas Amodio
Represented By: Thomas P. Amodio
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?