Orzalli v. Saul
Plaintiff: Heather Orzalli
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv00130
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Docket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket #10 , when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Agency record due w/in 60 days of initial appearance; opening brief due w/in 30 days; answering brief due w/in 30 days; reply w/in 14 days. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 7/22/2020. (SDW, COURT STAFF)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons & complaint served on USAG on 7/13/20, filed by Heather Orzalli. (Meserow, Nancy)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons & complaint served on OGC on 7/10/20, filed by Heather Orzalli. (Meserow, Nancy)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons & complaint served on US Atty Dist. of Alaska on 7/9/20, filed by Heather Orzalli. (Meserow, Nancy)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E Skrocki on behalf of Andrew Saul (Skrocki, Steven)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nancy J. Meserow, at docket #3 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (SDW, COURT STAFF)
June 9, 2020 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (KMC, COURT STAFF)
June 9, 2020 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Office of General Counsel, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Office of Attorney General of the USA)(KMC, COURT STAFF)
June 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Nancy J. Meserow. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2888043.) by Heather Orzalli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit certificate of good standing)(Meserow, Nancy)
June 9, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Meserow, Nancy)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2887981.), filed by Heather Orzalli. (Attachments: #1 Attachment (ALJ Dec.)(redacted))(Meserow, Nancy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orzalli v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Steven E Skrocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Orzalli
Represented By: Nancy J. Meserow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?