Fruichantie v. Saul
Plaintiff: Thomas Joe Fruichantie
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv00131
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Joe Fruichantie. Andrew M. Saul served on 7/14/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 certified mail receipt)(Jones, Daniel)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle R. Mroczek on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Mroczek, Danielle)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E Skrocki on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Skrocki, Steven)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel S. Jones, at docket #3 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (SDW, COURT STAFF)
June 9, 2020 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (LMH, COURT STAFF)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant US Attorney, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant AG, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant SSA)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Daniel S. Jones. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2887191.) by Thomas Joe Fruichantie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jones, Daniel)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Jones, Daniel)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2887169.), filed by Thomas Joe Fruichantie.(Jones, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fruichantie v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Joe Fruichantie
Represented By: Daniel S. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Danielle R. Mroczek
Represented By: Steven E Skrocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?