Disability Law Center of Alaska et al v. Meyer et al
Plaintiff: Camille Rose Nelson, Alaska Public Interest Research Group, Disability Law Center of Alaska, Native Peoples Action Community Fund and Aleija Stover
Defendant: Kevin Meyer and State of Alaska, Division of Elections
Amicus Curiae: Honest Elections Project, Alaska Community Action On Toxics, Planned Parenthood Votes Northwest and Hawaii and Alaska Center Education Fund
Case Number: 3:2020cv00173
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Joshua M Kindred
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #38 MOTION re #37 Notice of Appeal, Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal Opposition to Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal filed by State of Alaska, Division of Elections. (Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
September 4, 2020 Filing 40 USCA Case Number 20-35778 for #37 Notice of Appeal, filed by Aleija Stover, Disability Law Center of Alaska, Alaska Public Interest Research Group, Native Peoples Action Community Fund, Camille Rose Nelson. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
September 4, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION re #37 Notice of Appeal, Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal by Alaska Public Interest Research Group, Disability Law Center of Alaska, Native Peoples Action Community Fund, Camille Rose Nelson, Aleija Stover. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kendall, Scott)
September 4, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #36 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Alaska Public Interest Research Group, Disability Law Center of Alaska, Native Peoples Action Community Fund, Camille Rose Nelson, Aleija Stover. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 097--2934382. (Kendall, Scott)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 9/3/2020. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
September 1, 2020 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint Answer by All Defendants.(Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
August 25, 2020 Filing 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joshua M. Kindred: Oral Argument on Motion for Preliminary Injunction #12 held 9:04 a.m. to 10:07 a.m. on 8/25/2020. Court and counsel heard re #12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Oral arguments heard. Matter TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Written ruling to issue. VIRTUAL APPEARANCES: Scott M. Kendall telephonic for Plaintiff; Jason Seth Harrow and Michael Nicholas Donofrio via Video for Plaintiff; Margaret A. Paton-Walsh via Video for Defendant; Kerry Ann Baker telephonic for Intervenor Plaintiff; Sonja L. Reeves, Official Court Reporter. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
August 20, 2020 Filing 33 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Keri-Ann Baker on behalf of Alaska Center Education Fund, Alaska Community Action On Toxics, Planned Parenthood Votes Northwest and Hawaii. (Baker, Keri-Ann)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 8/19/2020. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
August 18, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amicus Brief by Alaska Center Education Fund, Alaska Community Action On Toxics, Disability Law Center of Alaska, Planned Parenthood Votes Northwest and Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Counsel, #2 Proposed Order)(Baker, Keri-Ann)
August 18, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Keri-Ann Baker on behalf of Alaska Center Education Fund, Alaska Community Action On Toxics, Disability Law Center of Alaska, Planned Parenthood Votes Northwest and Hawaii (Baker, Keri-Ann)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Order re: Intervention and Briefs of Amici Curiae (Dockets 17, 18, 26). (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
August 10, 2020 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Alaska Public Interest Research Group, Disability Law Center of Alaska, Native Peoples Action Community Fund, Camille Rose Nelson, Aleija Stover. (Kendall, Scott)
August 6, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Intervene Opposition to Motion to Intervene filed by State of Alaska, Division of Elections. (Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
August 3, 2020 Filing 26 Amicus Brief by Honest Elections Project. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Richards, Craig) Modified on 8/12/2020 to change docket text per Order dkt 29. (RMC, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2020 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Josh Applebee re #22 Response in Opposition to Motion by State of Alaska, Division of Elections. (Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
August 3, 2020 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Gail Fenumiai re #22 Response in Opposition to Motion by State of Alaska, Division of Elections. (Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
August 3, 2020 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Anne Zink re #22 Response in Opposition to Motion by State of Alaska, Division of Elections. (Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
August 3, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Alaska, Division of Elections. (Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
August 3, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion (Non-Opposition) re #17 MOTION to Intervene Plaintiffs' Non-Opposition to Amici Participation filed by Alaska Public Interest Research Group, Disability Law Center of Alaska, Native Peoples Action Community Fund, Camille Rose Nelson, Aleija Stover. (Kendall, Scott)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SEALED ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE; granting re #10 Stipulation re Briefing Schedule. Motion for Preliminary Injunction due 7/22/20; Responses due by 8/3/2020; Replies due by 8/10/2020. Virtual Oral Argument set for 8/25/2020 9:00 a.m. in Virtual Courtroom 1 before Joshua M. Kindred. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 7/28/20. (Attachments: #1 Virtual Courtroom 1 Quick Guide)(RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #11 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 7/28/2020. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
July 28, 2020 Filing 18 JOINDER TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Alaska Center Education Fund, Alaska Community Action On Toxics, Planned Parenthood Votes Northwest and Hawaii #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Aleija Stover, Disability Law Center of Alaska, Alaska Public Interest Research Group, Native Peoples Action Community Fund, Camille Rose Nelson. (Amodio, Thomas)
July 28, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Intervene by Alaska Community Action On Toxics, Planned Parenthood Votes Northwest and Hawaii, Alaska Center Education Fund. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Proposed Order)(Amodio, Thomas)
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE re #7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Nicholas Donofrio, at docket #7 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 27, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE re #4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason Seth Harrow, at docket #4 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 22, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Scott M. Kendall re #13 Memorandum,, #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Alaska Public Interest Research Group, Disability Law Center of Alaska, Native Peoples Action Community Fund, Camille Rose Nelson, Aleija Stover. (Kendall, Scott)
July 22, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Alaska Public Interest Research Group, Disability Law Center of Alaska, Native Peoples Action Community Fund, Camille Rose Nelson, Aleija Stover #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Aleija Stover, Disability Law Center of Alaska, Alaska Public Interest Research Group, Native Peoples Action Community Fund, Camille Rose Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Kendall, Scott)
July 22, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Alaska Public Interest Research Group, Disability Law Center of Alaska, Native Peoples Action Community Fund, Camille Rose Nelson, Aleija Stover. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kendall, Scott)
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION on Overlength Briefing by Alaska Public Interest Research Group, Disability Law Center of Alaska, Native Peoples Action Community Fund, Camille Rose Nelson, Aleija Stover. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kendall, Scott)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION re Briefing Schedule by Alaska Public Interest Research Group, Disability Law Center of Alaska, Native Peoples Action Community Fund, Camille Rose Nelson, Aleija Stover. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kendall, Scott)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE Proposed Order Granting Motion to Amend Complaint by Alaska Public Interest Research Group, Disability Law Center of Alaska, Native Peoples Action Community Fund, Camille Rose Nelson, Aleija Stover re #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, (Kendall, Scott)
July 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, by Alaska Public Interest Research Group, Disability Law Center of Alaska, Native Peoples Action Community Fund, Camille Rose Nelson, Aleija Stover. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Kendall, Scott)
July 21, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Michael Donofrio. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2909962.) by Alaska Public Interest Research Group, Disability Law Center of Alaska, Native Peoples Action Community Fund, Camille Rose Nelson, Aleija Stover. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Donofrio, Michael)
July 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE Notice of Completed Filing by State of Alaska, Division of Elections (Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by All Defendants (Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Jason Harrow. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2909546.) by Alaska Public Interest Research Group, Disability Law Center of Alaska, Native Peoples Action Community Fund, Camille Rose Nelson, Aleija Stover.(Harrow, Jason)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Paton-Walsh, Margaret)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants Defendant's Notice of Removal from Superior Court for the State of Alaska Third Judicial District at Anchorage, case number 3AN-20-07060CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2908757), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Paton-Walsh, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Disability Law Center of Alaska et al v. Meyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camille Rose Nelson
Represented By: Scott M. Kendall
Represented By: Michael Nicholas Donofrio
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Public Interest Research Group
Represented By: Scott M. Kendall
Represented By: Michael Nicholas Donofrio
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Disability Law Center of Alaska
Represented By: Scott M. Kendall
Represented By: Michael Nicholas Donofrio
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Represented By: Keri-Ann Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Native Peoples Action Community Fund
Represented By: Scott M. Kendall
Represented By: Michael Nicholas Donofrio
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aleija Stover
Represented By: Scott M. Kendall
Represented By: Michael Nicholas Donofrio
Represented By: Jason Seth Harrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Meyer
Represented By: Margaret A. Paton-Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska, Division of Elections
Represented By: Margaret A. Paton-Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Honest Elections Project
Represented By: Craig W. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Alaska Community Action On Toxics
Represented By: Thomas P. Amodio
Represented By: Keri-Ann Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Planned Parenthood Votes Northwest and Hawaii
Represented By: Thomas P. Amodio
Represented By: Keri-Ann Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Alaska Center Education Fund
Represented By: Thomas P. Amodio
Represented By: Keri-Ann Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?