Lindfors v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Corinne Lindfors
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00178
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's errata at docket #20 . Plaintiff's Reply to State Farm's Opposition to Motion to Remand at docket #20 is accepted as filed and replaces the document at docket #18 . (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ERRATA AND MOTION THAT CORRECTED BRIEF BE SUBSTITUTED IN PLACE OF BRIEF FILED AT DOCKET 18 by Corinne Lindfors #18 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Corinne Lindfors. (Fannon, Joshua)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Signed Affidavit of Kimberlee A. Colbo by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company re #16 Affidavit (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Colbo, Kimberlee)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Corinne Lindfors. (Angstman, Myron) Modified on 9/18/2020 corrected filing made at dkt 20 dkt 18 should be disregarded per order at dkt 21 (JLH, COURT STAFF).
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Unsigned Affidavit of Kimberlee A. Colbo by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company re #16 Affidavit (Colbo, Kimberlee)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Kimberlee A. Colbo re #15 Response in Opposition to Motion by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Colbo, Kimberlee)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Colbo, Kimberlee)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2022 at 3:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Sharon L. Gleason. Trial by Jury set for 2/22/2022 at 9:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 2 before Sharon L. Gleason. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 8/27/2022. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Discovery deadline 9/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 7/2/2021. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 8/26/2020. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF) (Main Document 13 replaced with corrected date 8/26/2020) (JLH, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE Of Corrected Signature Page by Corinne Lindfors re #11 First MOTION to Remand to State Court (Fannon, Joshua)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Corinne Lindfors. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Fannon Affidavit w/ attachments)(Fannon, Joshua)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Fannon, Joshua)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Myron E. Angstman on behalf of Corinne Lindfors (Angstman, Myron)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Colbo, Kimberlee)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A; Case Description, #2 Exhibit B; Counsel of Record, #3 Exhibit C; Demand for Jury Trial, #4 Exhibit D; Entry of Appearance as Co-Counsel, #5 Exhibit E; Affidavit of Civil Rule, #6 Exhibit F; Entry of Appearance, #7 Exhibit G; Demand for Jury Trial, #8 Exhibit H; Initial Pretrial Order)(Colbo, Kimberlee)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Colbo, Kimberlee)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 7/28/2020. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Colbo, Kimberlee)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (KMC, COURT STAFF)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (KMC, COURT STAFF)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from State of Alaska, Third Judicial District, case number 3AN-20-6589CI. ( Filing fee $ 400/Receipt #ANC017037), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(KMC, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindfors v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Kimberlee A. Colbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corinne Lindfors
Represented By: Joshua F. Fannon
Represented By: Myron E. Angstman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?