Imawan v. Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation
Plaintiff: Fony Imawan
Defendant: Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00180
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/14/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 11/16/2021. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 8/28/20. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Joint Scheduling Report by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation re #6 Initial Case Status Report Order (Hodes, Elizabeth)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Entry of Appearance)(Hodes, Elizabeth)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation (Hodes, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 ERRATA re Answer by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation #5 Answer to Complaint filed by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Answer)(Hodes, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order.. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 7/27/20. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation.(Hodes, Elizabeth)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation. (Hodes, Elizabeth)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (KMC, COURT STAFF)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Hodes, Elizabeth)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation from Alaska Superior Court, case number 3AN-20-06701CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2912403), filed by Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Hodes, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Imawan v. Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kikiktagruk Inupiat Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth Pifke Hodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fony Imawan
Represented By: Isaac D. Zorea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?