North Slope Borough, Inupiat Community of the Arctic Slope et al v. Ross et al
Plaintiff: North Slope Borough, Arctic Slope Regional Corporation and Inupiat Community of the Arctic Slope
Defendant: Wilbur Ross and National Marine Fisheries Service
Case Number: 3:2020cv00181
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Referring Judge: Joshua M Kindred
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Summons Reissued as to National Marine Fisheries Service. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 Unissued summons re Defendant C. Oliver, (LMH, COURT STAFF)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 TMB TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge Timothy M. Burgess hereby recuses himself from the above-referenced case. Pursuant to the system of random case assignments, this action is reassigned to Judge Joshua M. Kindred for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:20-cv-00181-JMK. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
July 29, 2020 Summons Issued as to National Marine Fisheries Service, Wilbur Ross, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (LMH, COURT STAFF)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Barr, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Jacobs, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Oliver, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Ross, #4 Unissued Summons re Defendant US Atty)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Tyson C. Kade. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2912613.) by Arctic Slope Regional Corporation, Inupiat Community of the Arctic Slope, North Slope Borough. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kade, Tyson)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Kade, Tyson)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2912494.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition to Delist, #2 Exhibit 60-Day Notice of Intent to Sue, #3 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Kade, Tyson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Slope Borough, Inupiat Community of the Arctic Slope et al v. Ross et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Slope Borough
Represented By: Tyson C. Kade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arctic Slope Regional Corporation
Represented By: Tyson C. Kade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inupiat Community of the Arctic Slope
Represented By: Tyson C. Kade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?