Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance et al v. Ocean Beauty Seafoods, LLC
Plaintiff: Liberty Insurance Corporation and Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance
Defendant: Ocean Beauty Seafoods, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00201
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Status Report. This case is stayed until 12/23/2020. Parties shall file a status report by 12/23/2020 unless parties have resolved case. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT RE: SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance. (Michael, Kevin)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re Notice to Counsel. Plaintiff shall either file the proof of service by 9/24/2020, or file a status report concerning service of the complaint on defendant. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 8/27/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 18, 2020 Summons Issued as to Ocean Beauty Seafoods, LLC. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Ocean Beauty Seafoods, (LMH, COURT STAFF)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF AND REIMBURSEMENT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400/Receipt #097--2924073), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index to Exhibits A-H, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Ex. C, #5 Exhibit Ex. D, #6 Exhibit Ex. E, #7 Exhibit Ex. F, #8 Exhibit Ex. G, #9 Exhibit Ex. H)(Michael, Kevin) Modified on 8/18/2020 to reflect date filed and added receipt number.(PXS, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Insurance Corporation, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance. (Michael, Kevin)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Civil Cover Sheet. (Michael, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance et al v. Ocean Beauty Seafoods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Kevin A. Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance
Represented By: Kevin A. Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Beauty Seafoods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?