Gwich'in Steering Committee et al v. Bernhardt et al
Plaintiff: Alaska Wilderness League, Alaska Wildlife Alliance, Friends of Alaska National Wildlife Refuges, National Wildlife Refuge Association, The Wilderness Society, Sierra Club, Environment America, Inc., National Wildlife Federation, Defenders of Wildlife, Gwich'in Steering Committee, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, Wilderness Watch and Canadian Parks & Wilderness Society-Yukon
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management, David Bernhardt, U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service and United States Department of the Interior
Case Number: 3:2020cv00204
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Referring Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting the Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and Stipulation to File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint at docket #17 . See order for details. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/16/2020. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
October 15, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and stipulation re amended complaint by Alaska Wilderness League, Alaska Wildlife Alliance, Canadian Parks & Wilderness Society-Yukon, Defenders of Wildlife, Environment America, Inc., Friends of Alaska National Wildlife Refuges, Gwich'in Steering Committee, National Wildlife Federation, National Wildlife Refuge Association, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, Sierra Club, The Wilderness Society, Wilderness Watch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brisson, Brook)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying as moot #15 Motion for Leave to File Agency Administrative Records on Electronic Media. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/1/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 30, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File (UNOPPOSED Motion to Conventionally File Agency Administrative Records on Electronic Media) by David Bernhardt, Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Department of the Interior. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Mark)
September 24, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alaska Wildlife Alliance, Defenders of Wildlife, Environment America, Inc., Gwich'in Steering Committee, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, Canadian Parks & Wilderness Society-Yukon, Alaska Wilderness League, National Wildlife Federation, The Wilderness Society, Sierra Club, National Wildlife Refuge Association, Friends of Alaska National Wildlife Refuges, Wilderness Watch. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Bureau of Land Management Summons, #2 Affidavit Department of the Interior Summons, #3 Affidavit Fish and Wildlife Service Summons, #4 Receipt of Service by AK USA)(Brisson, Brook)
September 22, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Related Cases by Alaska Wilderness League, Alaska Wildlife Alliance, Canadian Parks & Wilderness Society-Yukon, Defenders of Wildlife, Environment America, Inc., Friends of Alaska National Wildlife Refuges, Gwich'in Steering Committee, National Wildlife Federation, National Wildlife Refuge Association, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, Sierra Club, The Wilderness Society, Wilderness Watch (Brisson, Brook)
September 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Turcke on behalf of All Defendants (Turcke, Paul)
September 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Arthur Brown on behalf of David Bernhardt, Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Department of the Interior (Brown, Mark)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 JMK TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Joshua M. Kindred hereby recuses himself from the above-referenced case. Pursuant to the system of random case assignments, this action is reassigned to Judge Sharon L. Gleason for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:20-cv-00204-SLG. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 JUDGE HOLLAND TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to the system of random case reassignments, this action is hereby reassigned to Honorable Joshua M. Kindred for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all further filings: 3:20-cv-00204-JMK. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 JWS TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL. The assigned judge recuses from presiding in this case. This case has been re-assigned by random draw to Hon. Senior Judge H. Russel Holland. Henceforth the case number will be 3:20-cv-00204-HRH. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE re #5 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Karimah Schoenhut, at docket #5 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (RMC, COURT STAFF)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case by Alaska Wilderness League, Alaska Wildlife Alliance, Canadian Parks & Wilderness Society-Yukon, Defenders of Wildlife, Environment America, Inc., Friends of Alaska National Wildlife Refuges, Gwich'in Steering Committee, National Wildlife Federation, National Wildlife Refuge Association, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, Sierra Club, The Wilderness Society, Wilderness Watch (Brisson, Brook)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Karimah Schoenhut by Sierra Club. Filing Fee $150/Receipt #097--2927541. (Attachments: #1 Good Standing Certificate)(Schoenhut, Karimah) Modified on 8/24/2020 to add receipt number (PXS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant David Bernhardt, (Attachments: #1 Bureau of Land Management, #2 United States Department of the Interior, #3 U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alaska Wilderness League, Alaska Wildlife Alliance, Canadian Parks & Wilderness Society-Yukon, Defenders of Wildlife, Environment America, Inc., Friends of Alaska National Wildlife Refuges, Gwich'in Steering Committee, National Wildlife Federation, National Wildlife Refuge Association, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, Sierra Club, The Wilderness Society, Wilderness Watch. (Brisson, Brook)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(Brisson, Brook)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2927509.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Brisson, Brook)
August 24, 2020 Summons Issued as to David Bernhardt, Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service, United States Department of the Interior (PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gwich'in Steering Committee et al v. Bernhardt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown
Represented By: Paul A. Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown
Represented By: Paul A. Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown
Represented By: Paul A. Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown
Represented By: Paul A. Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Wilderness League
Represented By: Bridget Earley Psarianos
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Represented By: Brook Brisson
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Wildlife Alliance
Represented By: Bridget Earley Psarianos
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Represented By: Brook Brisson
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of Alaska National Wildlife Refuges
Represented By: Bridget Earley Psarianos
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Represented By: Brook Brisson
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Wildlife Refuge Association
Represented By: Bridget Earley Psarianos
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Represented By: Brook Brisson
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Wilderness Society
Represented By: Bridget Earley Psarianos
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Represented By: Brook Brisson
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Bridget Earley Psarianos
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Represented By: Karimah Schoenhut
Represented By: Brook Brisson
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environment America, Inc.
Represented By: Bridget Earley Psarianos
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Represented By: Brook Brisson
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Wildlife Federation
Represented By: Bridget Earley Psarianos
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Represented By: Brook Brisson
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Bridget Earley Psarianos
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Represented By: Brook Brisson
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwich'in Steering Committee
Represented By: Bridget Earley Psarianos
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Represented By: Brook Brisson
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northern Alaska Environmental Center
Represented By: Bridget Earley Psarianos
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Represented By: Brook Brisson
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilderness Watch
Represented By: Bridget Earley Psarianos
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Represented By: Brook Brisson
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Canadian Parks & Wilderness Society-Yukon
Represented By: Bridget Earley Psarianos
Represented By: Brian Litmans
Represented By: Brook Brisson
Represented By: Suzanne Bostrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?