National Audubon Society et al v. Bernhardt et al
Plaintiff: Friends of the Earth, National Audubon Society, Natural Resources Defense Council and Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management, United States Fish And Wildlife Service and David Bernhardt
Case Number: 3:2020cv00205
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Referring Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on David Bernhardt, Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, William Barr, and Bryan Schroder on August 25, 2020 (Bryan Schroder); August 31, 2020 (David Bernhardt, Bureau of Land Management, U.S. Fish and Service, and William Barr ), filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, National Audubon Society, Natural Resources Defense Council. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Grafe, Erik)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ADMINISTRATIVE APPEAL SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/2/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 2, 2020 Docket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket #16 , when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 22, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Turcke on behalf of All Defendants (Turcke, Paul)
September 22, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Arthur Brown on behalf of All Defendants (Brown, Mark)
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Related Cases by Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, National Audubon Society, Natural Resources Defense Council (Grafe, Erik)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice re Attorney Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence, at docket #7 , is hereby GRANTED. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice re Attorney Jared E. Knicley, at docket #5 , is hereby GRANTED. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice re Attorney Garett R. Rose, at docket #4 , is hereby GRANTED. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 TMB TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: By agreement of the judges, the above referenced case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Sharon L. Gleason for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:20-cv-00205-SLG. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Related Case by Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, National Audubon Society, Natural Resources Defense Council (Grafe, Erik)
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2927722.) by Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, National Audubon Society, Natural Resources Defense Council.(Lawrence, Nathaniel)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 Unissued summons re Defendant David Bernhardt, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Bureau of Land Management, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant United States Fish And Wildlife Service, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney, #4 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney General)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Jared E. Knicley. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2927594.) by Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, National Audubon Society, Natural Resources Defense Council.(Knicley, Jared)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Garett R. Rose. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2927583.) by Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, National Audubon Society, Natural Resources Defense Council.(Rose, Garett)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, National Audubon Society, Natural Resources Defense Council. (Grafe, Erik)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Grafe, Erik)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Bernhardt, Bureau of Land Management, United States Fish And Wildlife Service ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2927556.), filed by Natural Resources Defense Council, Friends of the Earth, National Audubon Society, Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant David Bernhardt, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Bureau of Land Management, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant US Fish and Wildlife Service, #4 Unissued Summons re Defendant Attorney General William Barr, #5 Unissued Summons re Defendant US Attorney Bryan Schroder)(Grafe, Erik)
August 24, 2020 Summons Issued as to David Bernhardt, Bureau of Land Management, United States Fish And Wildlife Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Audubon Society et al v. Bernhardt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the Earth
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Jared Eldridge Knicley
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Erik Clifford Grafe
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Audubon Society
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Jared Eldridge Knicley
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Erik Clifford Grafe
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Jared Eldridge Knicley
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Erik Clifford Grafe
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Represented By: Jared Eldridge Knicley
Represented By: Nathaniel S.W. Lawrence
Represented By: Erik Clifford Grafe
Represented By: Katharine S. Glover
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown
Represented By: Paul A. Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish And Wildlife Service
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown
Represented By: Paul A. Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown
Represented By: Paul A. Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?