Native Village of Venetie Tribal Government et al v. Bernhardt et al
Plaintiff: Arctic Village Council, Native Village of Venetie Tribal Government and Venetie Village Council
Defendant: United States Fish And Wildlife Service, United States Department of the Interior, David L. Bernhardt and United States Bureau of Land Management
Case Number: 3:2020cv00223
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Referring Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 668
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ADMINISTRATIVE APPEAL SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/2/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 2, 2020 Docket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket #9 , when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summonses served on David L. Bernhardt, Department of the Interior, Bureau of Land Management, Fish & Wildlife Service, William P. Barr, Bryan Schroder on Sept. 21, 2020 (Bernhardt); Sept. 21, 2020 (DOI); Sept. 25, 2020 (BLM); Sept. 21, 2020 (FWS); Sept. 21, 2020 (Barr); Sept. 15, 2020 (Schroder), filed by Arctic Village Council, Native Village of Venetie Tribal Government, Venetie Village Council. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bernhardt Service, #2 Exhibit DOI Service, #3 Exhibit BLM Service, #4 Exhibit FWS Service, #5 Exhibit Barr Service, #6 Exhibit Schroder Service)(Furlong, Wesley)
September 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Turcke on behalf of All Defendants (Turcke, Paul)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 Unissued summons re Defendant D. Bernhardt, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant W. Barr, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant BLM, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant DOI, #4 Unissued Summons re Defendant FWS, #5 Unissued Summons re Defendant B. Schroder)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
September 11, 2020 Summons Issued as to David L. Bernhardt, United States Bureau of Land Management, United States Department of the Interior, United States Fish And Wildlife Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 HRH TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to the system of random case assignments, this action is reassigned to Judge Sharon L. Gleason for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:20-cv-00223-SLG. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 JMK TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Joshua M. Kindred hereby recuses himself from the above-referenced case. Pursuant to the system of random case assignments, this action is reassigned to Senior Judge H. Russel Holland for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:20-cv-00223-HRH. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Cases by Arctic Village Council, Native Village of Venetie Tribal Government, Venetie Village Council (Newman, Matthew)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Newman, Matthew)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2935976.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Newman, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Native Village of Venetie Tribal Government et al v. Bernhardt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arctic Village Council
Represented By: Megan Rachel Condon
Represented By: Karen E. Schmidt
Represented By: Teresa B Clemmer
Represented By: Peter H. Van Tuyn
Represented By: Matthew Neil Newman
Represented By: Wesley James Furlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Native Village of Venetie Tribal Government
Represented By: Megan Rachel Condon
Represented By: Karen E. Schmidt
Represented By: Teresa B Clemmer
Represented By: Peter H. Van Tuyn
Represented By: Matthew Neil Newman
Represented By: Wesley James Furlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Venetie Village Council
Represented By: Megan Rachel Condon
Represented By: Karen E. Schmidt
Represented By: Teresa B Clemmer
Represented By: Peter H. Van Tuyn
Represented By: Matthew Neil Newman
Represented By: Wesley James Furlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish And Wildlife Service
Represented By: Paul A. Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Represented By: Paul A. Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Bernhardt
Represented By: Paul A. Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Paul A. Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?