Maritech Marine Services, LLC v. Bay Welding Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Maritech Marine Services, LLC
Defendant: Bay Welding Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00231
Filed: September 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Bay Welding Services, Inc..(Wuestenfeld, William)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hurst, Robert)
November 3, 2020 Filing 9 SLG TEXT ORDER: The parties Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Scheduling and Planning Conference Report at Docket 8 is GRANTED. The report shall be filed no later than 11/12/2020. (CFR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
October 30, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Scheduling Conference Report (UNOPPOSED) by Maritech Marine Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hurst, Robert)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order.. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 10/7/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Wuestenfeld on behalf of Bay Welding Services, Inc. (Wuestenfeld, William)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Reissued as to Bay Welding Services, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 23, 2020 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Bay Welding Services, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 21, 2020 Summons Issued as to Bay Welding Services, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Bay Welding Services, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 21, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Hurst, Robert)
September 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bay Welding Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400/receipt #ANC017208), filed by Maritech Marine Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Hurst, Robert) Modified on 9/22/2020 to add receipt number(PXS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maritech Marine Services, LLC v. Bay Welding Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritech Marine Services, LLC
Represented By: Robert I Hurst
Represented By: R. Isaak Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bay Welding Services, Inc.
Represented By: William M. Wuestenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?