Metlakatla Indian Community v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: Metlakatla Indian Community
Defendant: Alex M Azar, United States of America and RADM Michael D Weahkee
Case Number: 3:2020cv00282
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT on Service by Metlakatla Indian Community. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Strommer, Geoffrey)
December 16, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Alex Azar, Secretary, US Dept. of Health and Human Svcs. on November 18, 2020, filed by Metlakatla Indian Community. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Strommer, Geoffrey)
December 16, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States on November 19, 2020, filed by Metlakatla Indian Community. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Strommer, Geoffrey)
December 16, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Bryan Schroder, US Atty for District of Alaska on November 16, 2020, filed by Metlakatla Indian Community. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Strommer, Geoffrey)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re Notice to Counsel. Plaintiff shall either file proofs of service or a status report concerning service of the complaint on defendants by 12/18/2020. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 11/16/20. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
November 10, 2020 Summons Issued as to Alex M Azar, William P. Barr, Bryan Schroder, RADM Michael D Weahkee. (KMC, COURT STAFF)
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 Unissued summons re Defendant Alex M Azar, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Bryan Schroder, United States Attorney for the District of Alaska, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Michael Weahkee, Director, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant William P. Barr, Attorney General of the United States)(KMC, COURT STAFF)
November 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case by Metlakatla Indian Community (Strommer, Geoffrey)
November 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case by Metlakatla Indian Community (Strommer, Geoffrey)
November 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case by Metlakatla Indian Community (Strommer, Geoffrey)
November 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case by Metlakatla Indian Community (Strommer, Geoffrey)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Strommer, Geoffrey)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2967984.), filed by Metlakatla Indian Community.(Strommer, Geoffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metlakatla Indian Community v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RADM Michael D Weahkee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metlakatla Indian Community
Represented By: Geoffrey D. Strommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?