Finney v. Howey
Plaintiff: Brannon Finney
Defendant: Bryan R. Howey
Case Number: 3:2020cv00289
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Bryan R. Howey. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 29, 2020 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Lafcadio Darling re #5 MOTION for Entry of Default by Brannon Finney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Darling, Lafcadio)
December 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Entry of Default by Brannon Finney. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Darling, Lafcadio)
December 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brannon Finney. Bryan R. Howey served on 12/4/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 3, 2020 Filing fee: $400, receipt number CR2 AKXDCLERK21-0004 (PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Bryan R. Howey, (KMC, COURT STAFF)
November 20, 2020 Summons Issued as to Bryan R. Howey. (KMC, COURT STAFF)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (KMC, COURT STAFF)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bryan R. Howey (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Brannon Finney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KMC, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finney v. Howey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan R. Howey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brannon Finney
Represented By: Lafcadio H. Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?