State of Alaska, Department of Transportation & Public Facilities v. 2.396 Acres More or Less Near Bethel, Alaska et al
Plaintiff: State of Alaska, Department of Transportation & Public Facilities
Defendant: 3,344 Sq. Ft. More or Less Near Bethel, Alaska, Vincento Polk, Jason Polk, 2.396 Acres More or Less Near Bethel, Alaska, Warren Polk, Sophie Evan, Earl Polk, III and Bureau of Indian Affairs
Case Number: 3:2020cv00306
Filed: December 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacquelyn A. Traini on behalf of Bureau of Indian Affairs (Traini, Jacquelyn)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Bureau of Indian Affairs answer due 2/26/2021. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 1/13/21. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
January 12, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Bureau of Indian Affairs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fonstad, John)
January 7, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Condemnation Action, Declaration of Taking (Parcel 2), Decisional Document (Parcel 2), Tract Description (Parcel 2), Declaration of Taking (Parcel 3), Decisional Document (Parcel 3), Tract Description (Parcel 3), and the Certificate of Service served on Defendants (All) on 12/18/2020-1/6/2021, filed by State of Alaska, Department of Transportation & Public Facilities. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Garner, Max)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 12/18/20. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 Unissued Notice re Earl Alphonzo Polk, III. (Attachments: #1 Unissued Notice re Eugene Peltola Jr., #2 Unissued Notice re Jason Blaine Polk, #3 Unissued Notice re Vincent Polk, #4 Unissued Notice re Warren Charles Polk, #5 Unissued Notice re Sophie Evan) (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 18, 2020 Notice of Condemnation Action Issued as to Eugene Peltola Jr. (Bureau of Indian Affairs), Sophie Evan, Earl Polk, III, Jason Polk, Vincento Polk, Warren Polk. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 16, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 2.396 Acres More or Less Near Bethel, Alaska, 3,344 Sq. Ft. More or Less Near Bethel, Alaska, Bureau of Indian Affairs, Sophie Evan, Earl Polk, III, Jason Polk, Vincento Polk, Warren Polk (Filing fee $402/Receipt #ANC017473.), filed by State of Alaska, Department of Transportation & Public Facilities. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Taking - Parcel 2, #2 Parcel 2 Schedules A.B.C., #3 Declaration of Taking - Parcel 3, #4 Parcel 3 Schedules A.B.C.)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 16, 2020 Receipt number ANC017475 in the amount of $99,400 received on 12/16/20 from State of Alaska regarding Notice of Deposit Parcel 2 (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 16, 2020 Receipt number ANC017474 in the amount of $8,000 received on 12/16/20 from State of Alaska regarding Notice of Deposit Parcel 3 (PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Alaska, Department of Transportation & Public Facilities v. 2.396 Acres More or Less Near Bethel, Alaska et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3,344 Sq. Ft. More or Less Near Bethel, Alaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincento Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.396 Acres More or Less Near Bethel, Alaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sophie Evan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Polk, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Indian Affairs
Represented By: Jacquelyn A. Traini
Represented By: John A. Fonstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Alaska, Department of Transportation & Public Facilities
Represented By: Max D. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?