Diamond v. Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium et al
Plaintiff: Daniel B Diamond
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium
Case Number: 3:2020cv00317
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to file documents electronically by Daniel B Diamond.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Daniel B Diamond.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE AND RESPONSE: The Application to Proceed without Prepaying Fees or Costs, at docket #4 , is granted. Service of process to be completed within 90 days. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 2/11/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel B Diamond. (Attachments: #1 1)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE: DEFICIENT FILING: Filing fee of $402.00 or application to waive prepayment of filing fee due within 30 days. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 1/25/21. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, filed by Daniel B Diamond. (Attachments: #1 Additional Complaint, #2 Proposed Order IFP)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond v. Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Native Tribal Health Consortium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel B Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?